EP1675503 - PLUNGER-LESS SYRINGE FOR CONTROLLING BLOOD FLOW [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Westmed, Inc. 109 Inverness Drive East, Suite A Englewood, CO 80112 / US | [2006/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCKINNON, Robert, J. 10036 S. Stratford Place Highlands Ranch, CO 80126 / US | 02 /
IWASAKI, Dean, H. 6640 E. 6th Ave. Parkway Denver, CO 80220 / US | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Raynor, John Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 04781200.3 | 16.08.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004US26477 | Priority number, date | US20030658890 | 09.09.2003 Original published format: US 658890 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005025639 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1675503 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.02.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15, A61B5/00, B65D81/00 | [2010/12] | CPC: |
A61B5/150312 (EP,US);
A61B5/15003 (EP,US);
A61B5/150213 (EP,US);
A61B5/150236 (EP,US);
A61B5/150244 (EP,US);
A61B5/150351 (EP,US);
A61B5/150389 (EP,US);
A61B5/150503 (EP,US);
A61B5/150755 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/27] | A61B5/00, B65D81/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/27] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOLBENLOSE SPRITZE ZUR KONTROLLE DES BLUTFLUSSES | [2006/27] | English: | PLUNGER-LESS SYRINGE FOR CONTROLLING BLOOD FLOW | [2006/27] | French: | SERINGUE SANS PISTON PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LE DEBIT SANGUIN | [2006/27] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 29.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/35] | 16.04.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/35] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL7306046 (INVECO WAALWIJK B.V.) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1390621 (SARSTEDT W SARSTEDT KUNSTSTOFF) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [XA]US4091802 (COLUMBUS RICHARD L) [X] 1,2,4,5,7-9 * abstract * * column 4, line 61 - column 6, line 38; figures 1-3 * * column 8, line 41 - column 9, line 6; figures 4a,4b * [A] 3,6; | [DA]US4133304 (BAILEY DONALD L) [DA] 1 * abstract *; | [A]US4245655 (PATEL BHUPENDRA C) [A] 1* abstract * | International search | [X]US5032117 (MOTTA LOUIS J [US]); | [X]US4753345 (GOODSIR STEPHEN W [US], et al) |