EP1663001 - MULTI-LANCET DEVICE WITH STERILITY CAP REPOSITIONING MECHANISM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.07.2010 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Facet Technologies, LLC 1850 Parkway Place, Suite 900 Marietta, GA 30067 / US | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TRISSEL, John 131 Wellington Canton, GA 30115 / US | 02 /
LEVAUGHN, Richard, W. 104 Pheasant Ridge Newnan, GA 30265 / US | 03 /
KENNEDY, Gwenn, R. 5 North Lakeside Drive Ellenwood, GA 30294 / US | 04 /
FLYNN, Stephen 605 Wheatleigh Curve Peachtree City, GA 30269 / US | 05 /
GRIFFIN, Carl, E. 2081 Breconridge Drive Marietta, GA 30064 / US | 06 /
IRWIN, John, C. 148 Springwater Trace Woodstock, GA 30188 / US | 07 /
PYNES, Mary, Kate 1175 Old Harris Road 312 Dallas, GA 30157 / US | 08 /
CAMPBELL, Stephanie, J. 1114 Hazeltine Lane Kennesaw, GA 30152 / US | 09 /
RUF, Christopher, J. 2120 Ithica Drive Marietta, GA 30067-7054 / US | 10 /
SOLIS, Mitchell, A. 1975 Lexington Lane Cumming, GA 30004 / US | 11 /
ROBBINS, Avi, M. 539 Timber Ridge Drive Longwood, FL 32779 / US | 12 /
HEATH, Jason, R. 1530 Mcadoo Drive SW Marietta, GA 30064 / US | 13 /
LATHROP, Ray 611 Glen Way Atlanta, GA 30319 / US | 14 /
BUENGER, David 4171 Edinburgh Trail Roswell, GA 30075 / US | 15 /
KATRAGADDA, Venkat 425 Williams Drive, Apartment 225 Marietta, GA 30066 / US | 16 /
GRIFFIS, Jack 1133 Druid Lake Decatur, GA 30033 / US | 17 /
GRIFFIN, Don 1575 Ridenour Parkway, Apartment 2319 Kennesaw, GA 30152 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Harland, Linda Jane Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Harland, Linda Jane c/o Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 04781455.3 | 19.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US26761 | Priority number, date | US20030497024P | 20.08.2003 Original published format: US 497024 P | US20040598147P | 02.08.2004 Original published format: US 598147 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005018454 | Date: | 03.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1663001 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/15 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A61B5/157 (EP,US);
A61B5/150022 (EP,US);
A61B5/150412 (EP,US);
A61B5/150519 (EP,US);
A61B5/150564 (EP,US);
A61B5/150618 (EP,US);
A61B5/150702 (EP,US);
A61B5/15113 (EP,US);
A61B5/15117 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MULTI-LANZETTENVORRICHTUNG MIT MECHANISMUS ZUR REPOSITIONIERUNG EINER STERILEN KAPPE | [2006/23] | English: | MULTI-LANCET DEVICE WITH STERILITY CAP REPOSITIONING MECHANISM | [2006/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF MULTI-LANCETTES COMPORTANT UN MECANISME DE REPOSITIONNEMENT DE CAPUCHON DE STERILITE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 22.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/34] | 06.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10208575 (HARTMANN PAUL AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,11,30 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085]; figures 15-17 *; | [AD]US6228100 (SCHRAGA STEVEN [US]) [AD] 1-17,30-32 * the whole document *; | [X]US6530892 (KELLY HELEN V [US]) [X] 18-29 * column 6, line 5 - line 30; figure 3 * |