EP1659991 - PRELOADED IOL INJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 14.06.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2013 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BAUSCH & LOMB INCORPORATED One Bausch & Lomb Place Rochester, New York 14604 / US | [2006/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAQUERO, Edward 17 Lanaray Park Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 02 /
RATHERT, Brian D. 200 Beach Drive NE Apt. 7 St. Petersburg, FL 33701 / US | 03 /
HEYMAN, Thomas, M. 1421 Dixon Place Placentia, CA 92870 / US | 04 /
TORP, Aaron, M. 135 Collingwood Drive Rochester, NY 14621 / US | 05 /
SCHOOPING, Martin, P. 38 Curtisdale Lane Hamlin, NY 14464 / US | 06 /
BRYAN, Phillip, L. 3179 Rush-Mendon Road Honeoye Falls, NY 14472 / US | 07 /
SEYBOTH, William, J. 38 Grecian Parkway Rochester, NY 14626 / US | 08 /
CLARK, George 3799 Waverly Place Lewis Center, OH 43035 / US | 09 /
EGAN, Robert, J. 6744 Route 20A Livonia, NY 14487 / US | 10 /
CULLEN, Jon, P. 2 Cassandra Circle Churchville, NY 14428 / US | [2013/29] |
Former [2006/22] | 01 /
VAQUERO, Edward 17 Lanaray Park Fairport, NY 14450 / US | ||
02 /
RATHERT, Brian D. 200 Beach Drive NE Apt. 7 St. Petersburg, FL 33701 / US | |||
03 /
HEYMAN, Thomas, M. 1421 Dixon Place Placentia, CA 92870 / US | |||
04 /
TORP, Aaron, M. 135 Collingwood Drive Rochester, NY 14621 / US | |||
05 /
SCHOOPING, Martin, P. 38 Curtisdale Lane Hamlin, NY 14464 / US | |||
06 /
BRYAN, Phillip, L. 3179 Rush-Mendon Road Honeoye Falls, NY 14472 / US | |||
07 /
SEYBOTH, William, J. 38 Grecian Parkway Rochester, NY 14626 / US | |||
08 /
CLARK, George 3799 Waverly Place Lewis Center, OH 43035 / US | |||
09 /
EGAN, Robert, J. 6744 Route 20A Livonia, NY 14487 / US | |||
10 /
CULLEN, Jon, P. 2 Cassandra Circle Churchville, NY 14428 / US | Representative(s) | Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2010/22] | Carpmael, Robert Maurice Charles, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/22] | Bowman, Paul Alan Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04781647.5 | 19.08.2004 | [2006/22] | WO2004US27003 | Priority number, date | US20030651785 | 28.08.2003 Original published format: US 651785 | US20040813862 | 31.03.2004 Original published format: US 813862 | [2006/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005023154 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1659991 | Date: | 31.05.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1659991 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/21] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1659991 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/16 | [2006/22] | CPC: |
A61F2/1691 (EP,US);
A61F2/16 (KR);
A61F2/167 (EP,US);
A61F2/1678 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT [2006/49] |
Former [2006/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORBELADENER IOL-INJEKTOR | [2007/49] | English: | PRELOADED IOL INJECTOR | [2006/22] | French: | INJECTEUR D'IMPLANT INTRAOCULAIRE PRECHARGE | [2006/22] |
Former [2006/22] | VOBELADENER IOL-INJEKTOR | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.02.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/22] | 05.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.04.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP06003906.2 / EP1674050 | EP06003936.9 / EP1671607 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.2010
ADMISSIBLE Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB Opponent's representative Forsythe, Dominic, et al, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/13] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
19.02.2010
ADMISSIBLE Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn GB-London WC1R 5JJ / GB Opponent's representative Forsythe, Dominic, et al, et al J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | 26.03.2010 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.07.2010 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 19.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 25.07.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 21.11.2012 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 27.02.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 30.05.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 01.10.2012 | Appeal received No. T2141/12 | 21.11.2012 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5304182 (RHEINISH ROBERT S [US], et al) [A] 1,2,5,32,35,36,44,52,54,58,60,62,66 * column 4, line 28 - column 4, line 30 * * column 5, line 25 - column 5, line 34; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US5578042 (CUMMING J STUART [US]) [A] 1,3-5,7,8,11-14,32,33,35,60,61,64,66,67 * column 3, line 2 - column 3, line 54 * * column 9, line 26 - column 9, line 39; figures 1,5,7,10 *; | [A]WO0164147 (STAAR SURGICAL CO INC [US], et al) [A] 1,5,64 * abstract *; | [A]US2002082609 (GREEN GEORGE F [US]) [A] 1-5,8,13-16,18,19,23,24,28,35-38,43,44,46-48,54,55,60-63,66-70 * page 2, paragraph 26 * * page 2, paragraph 28 * * page 3, paragraph 31 * * page 3, paragraph 33 - page 4, paragraph 34; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US6500181 (PORTNEY VALDEMAR [US]) [A] 17,19,21,23-28,30,35,36,45,47,49 * column 5, line 54 - column 5, line 59 * * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 64; figures 1,3 *; | [PA]WO2004010903 (DUCKWORTH & KENT LTD [GB], et al) [PA] 44-55* abstract * | Opposition | US6048347 | US2001007942 | US6468282 | US6471708 |