EP1663687 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POWER FLOW MANAGEMENT IN ELECTRO-MECHANICAL TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE TIMKEN COMPANY 1835 Dueber Avenue, S.W. Canton, OH 44706-0930 / US | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AI, Xiaolan 4480 Noble Loon Street, N.W. Massillon, OH 44646 / US | 02 /
ANDERSON, Scott 9700 Maple Crest Lane Palos Hills, IL 60465 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/15] | Marles, Alan David Stevens Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Marles, Alan David Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place Bristol BS1 4UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 04781975.0 | 24.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US27393 | Priority number, date | US20030648079 | 26.08.2003 Original published format: US 648079 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005021310 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663687 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663687 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60K6/445, B60W20/00, F16H3/72, // B60W10/08, B60W10/10, B60K6/365, B60K6/543 | [2011/45] | CPC: |
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60W20/10 (US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60K6/543 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/10 (EP,US);
F16H3/727 (EP,US);
F16H3/728 (EP,US);
B60K1/02 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
F16H2037/102 (EP,US);
F16H2200/2007 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | B60K6/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2006/48] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ENERGIEFLUSSMANAGEMENT IN ELEKTRO-MECHANISCHEM GETRIEBE | [2006/23] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POWER FLOW MANAGEMENT IN ELECTRO-MECHANICAL TRANSMISSION | [2006/23] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE GESTION DE FLUX DE PUISSANCE DANS UNE TRANSMISSION ELECTROMECANIQUE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 29.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.01.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.01.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2008 | Opposition(s) | 14.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 11.04.2012 | [2012/48] | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1247679 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1,3-13,19-27,31,32 * the whole document *; | [X]US6478705 (HOLMES ALAN G [US], et al) [X] 1 * abstract *; | [X]US2003078126 (HOLMES ALAN G [US], et al) [X] 1* abstract * | by applicant | EP0867323 | US5907191 | US5914575 | US5991683 | US6478705 |