EP1665609 - SUBCARRIER AND BIT ALLOCATION FOR REAL TIME SERVICES IN MULTIUSER ORTHOGONAL FREQUENCY DIVISION MULTIPLEX (OFDM) SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 20.06.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.07.2008 [2008/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 300 Delaware Avenue Suite 527 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 300 Delaware Avenue, Suite 527 Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Guodong 490 Main Street, Apt. C8 Farmingdale, NY 11735 / US | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 04782163.2 | 26.08.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US27609 | Priority number, date | US20030498074P | 27.08.2003 Original published format: US 498074 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005022810 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1665609 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.07.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/02 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
H04L5/023 (EP,KR,US);
H04L5/006 (KR);
H04L5/0046 (KR);
H04L5/1469 (KR);
H04W72/0453 (KR);
H04L5/0044 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/35] | H04K1/10, H03K7/02, H03C5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/23] | H04L1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SUBTRÄGER- UND BITZUTEILUNG FÜR ECHTZEIT-DIENSTE IN MEHRBENUTZER-OFDM-SYSTEMEN (ORTHOGONAL-FREQUENZMULTIPLEX) | [2006/23] | English: | SUBCARRIER AND BIT ALLOCATION FOR REAL TIME SERVICES IN MULTIUSER ORTHOGONAL FREQUENCY DIVISION MULTIPLEX (OFDM) SYSTEMS | [2006/23] | French: | ATTRIBUTION DE SOUS-PORTEUSES ET DE BITS POUR SERVICES EN TEMPS REEL DANS DES SYSTEMES MULTI-UTILISATEURS DE MULTIPLEXAGE PAR REPARTITION ORTHOGONALE DE LA FREQUENCE (MROF) | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0249306 (BROADSTORM TELECOMMUNICATIONS [US]) [Y] 1-18 * abstract * * paragraphs [0026] , [0027] , [0030] , [0039] , [0042] , [0044] - [0048] - [0068] , [0079] , [0081]; figure 1B *; | [Y] - CHEONG YUI WONG ET AL, "Multiuser OFDM with Adaptive Subcarrier, Bit, and Power Allocation", IEEE JOURNAL ON SELECTED AREAS IN COMMUNICATIONS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, US, (199910), vol. 17, no. 10, ISSN 0733-8716, XP011055027 [Y] 1-18 * abstract * | [A] - YIN H ET AL, "AN EFFICIENT MULTIUSER LOADING ALGORITHM FOR OFDM-BASED BROADBAND WIRELESS SYSTEMS", GLOBECOM'00. 2000 IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. SAN FRANCISCO, CA, NOV. 27 - DEC. 1, 2000, IEEE GLOBAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (20001127), VOL. 1 OF 3, ISBN 0-7803-6452-X, pages 103 - 107, XP001195543 [A] 1-18 * abstract * | International search | [A]US2004114560 (JACOBSEN ERIC A [US]); | [A]US2004171359 (TIRKKONEN OLAV [FI], et al); | [A]US2004192218 (OPREA ALEXANDRU M [CA]) |