EP1667711 - PREVENTIVE CANCER VACCINE BASED ON BROTHER OF REGULATOR OF IMPRINTED SITES MOLECULE (BORIS) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UniVax, LLC 1611 N. San Fernando Blvd., Suite D Burbank, CA 91504 / US | [2010/23] |
Former [2010/22] | For all designated states Vendevia Group, LLC 3440 Hollywood Boulevard Suite 100 Hollywood, FL 33160 / US | ||
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states OncoMune 290 North West 165th Street Suite P350 Miami, Florida 33169 / US | ||
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Agadjanyan, Michael G. 16371 Gothard Street, Unit H Huntington Beach, CA 92647 / US | ||
For all designated states Ghochikyan, Anahit 16371 Gothard Street, Unit H Huntington Beach, CA 92647 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AGADJANYAN, Michael G. c/o Departement of Molecular Immunology, Institute for Molecular Medecine 16371 Gothard Street, Unit H Huntington Beach, CA 92647 / US | 02 /
GHOCHIKYAN, Anahit c/o Departement of Molecular Immunology, Institute for Molecular Medecine 16371 Gothard Street, Unit H Huntindton Beach, CA 92647 / US | [2010/09] |
Former [2006/24] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Elsy, David, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Elsy, David, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 04782353.9 | 25.08.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US27856 | Priority number, date | US20030497511P | 25.08.2003 Original published format: US 497511 P | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005021029 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1667711 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1667711 | Date: | 28.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/00, A61P35/00, C12N5/0784 | [2010/08] | CPC: |
C07K14/4748 (EP,US);
A61K2239/31 (EP,US);
A61K39/4615 (EP,US);
A61K39/4622 (EP,US);
A61K39/464484 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
C12N5/0639 (EP,US);
A61K2039/5258 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | A61K39/00, A61P35/00, C12N5/08, C12N5/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PRÄVENTIVE KREBSVAKZINE AUF BASIS DES BORIS (BROTHER OF REGULATOR OF IMPRINTED SITES) MOLEKÜLS | [2006/24] | English: | PREVENTIVE CANCER VACCINE BASED ON BROTHER OF REGULATOR OF IMPRINTED SITES MOLECULE (BORIS) | [2006/24] | French: | VACCIN PREVENTIF CONTRE LE CANCER A BASE DE MOLECULE BORIS (FRERE DU REGULATEUR DE SITES MARQUES) | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 09.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.06.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.06.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 28.07.2010 | CY | 28.07.2010 | CZ | 28.07.2010 | EE | 28.07.2010 | FI | 28.07.2010 | PL | 28.07.2010 | PT | 28.07.2010 | RO | 28.07.2010 | SE | 28.07.2010 | SI | 28.07.2010 | SK | 28.07.2010 | TR | 28.07.2010 | IE | 25.08.2010 | LU | 25.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | BG | 28.10.2010 | GR | 29.10.2010 | ES | 08.11.2010 | HU | 29.01.2011 | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/47] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
TR | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LU | 25.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
LU | 25.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
HU | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
IE | 25.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
RO | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
ES | 08.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 28.07.2010 | ||
EE | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
SK | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | BE | 28.07.2010 | |
CY | 28.07.2010 | ||
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SE | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
GR | 29.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | CY | 28.07.2010 | |
FI | 28.07.2010 | ||
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | FI | 28.07.2010 | |
PL | 28.07.2010 | ||
SI | 28.07.2010 | ||
BG | 28.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [PX]WO03072799 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al); |