EP1691889 - PATIENT POSITIONING ASSEMBLY FOR THERAPEUTIC RADIATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Refusal of application | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accuray, Inc. 1310 Chesapeake Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | [2006/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EARNST, Eric 12759 Saratoga Woods Circle Saratoga, CA 95070 / US | 02 /
KUDUVALLI, Gopinath 3988 Williams Road San Jose, CA 95117 / CA | 03 /
MITROVIC, Vladimir 1081 Beach Park Blvd., Apt. 206 Foster City, CA 94404 / CA | 04 /
CORE, Matthew 100 North Whisman Road, Apt. 621 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2006/34] | Representative(s) | Bartle, Robin Jonathan, et al WP Thompson 8th Floor 1 Mann Island Liverpool L3 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Bartle, Robin Jonathan, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2006/36] | Bartle, Robin Jonathan, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Coopers Building Church Street Liverpool, Merseyside L1 3AB / GB | ||
Former [2006/34] | Curley, Donnacha John, et al Hanna, Moore & Curley 13 Lower Lad Lane Dublin 2 / IE | Application number, filing date | 04782483.4 | 27.08.2004 | [2006/34] | WO2004US28011 | Priority number, date | US20030687860 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: US 687860 | [2006/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005039472 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1691889 | Date: | 23.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61N5/10 | [2006/34] | CPC: |
A61N5/1049 (EP,US);
A61B6/0487 (EP,US);
A61B6/548 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1061 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1074 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/34] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PATIENTENPOSITIONIERUNGSANORDNUNG FÜR EIN THERAPEUTISCHES BESTRAHLUNGSSYSTEM | [2006/34] | English: | PATIENT POSITIONING ASSEMBLY FOR THERAPEUTIC RADIATION SYSTEM | [2006/34] | French: | ENSEMBLE DE POSITIONNEMENT DE PATIENT POUR SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT PAR RAYONNEMENT THERAPEUTIQUE | [2006/34] | Entry into regional phase | 12.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 12.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 12.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/34] | 30.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2013 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.06.2013 | 25.06.2013 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.06.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/46] | 07.07.2013 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9413205 (ACCURAY INC [US], et al) [X] 1-15,20-22,25,26,28-35,37 * abstract * * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 12 * * page 7, line 5 - page 10, line 26 * * page 18, lines 8-26 * [Y] 23,24,27; | [XY]WO9927839 (COSMAN ERIC R [US]) [X] 1-9,11,12,14,20-22,25,26,28-30,32,35 * abstract * * page 9, lines 11-20 * * page 10, lines 19-25 * * page 13, lines 6-20 * * page 16, line 21 - page 17, line 16 * * page 20, line 27 - page 23, line 14 * [Y] 13,23,24,27; | [Y]US6222544 (TARR RANDALL V [US], et al) [Y] 13,23,24,27 * abstract * * column 2, lines 38-52 * * column 6, lines 23-43 * * column 6, line 63 - column 9, line 16 *; | [X]EP1121957 (UNIV ST LOUIS [US]) [X] 1,5-8,14,20,21,28-30,35,36 * abstract ** paragraphs [0033] , [0036] , [0052] , [0065] *; | [X]US2002077545 (TAKAHASHI SHUICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,3-8,11,12,14,20,21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0029] - [0031] - [0051] , [0052] , [0062] , [0063] , [0068] - [0076] - [0090] , [0091] * | International search | [X]US6125164 (MURPHY MARTIN J [US], et al); | [XE]US6865253 (BLUMHOFER ANDREAS [DE], et al); | [YE]US6810108 (CLARK CHARLES [US], et al); | [Y]US6385286 (FITCHARD EDWARD E [US], et al) |