EP1649419 - A CUSTOMER SERVICE SUPPORT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2007 Database last updated on 26.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Medical Solutions Health Services Corporation 51, Valley Stream Parkway Malvern, PA 19355 / US | [2006/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DOUGLAS, James 119 South Kelly Drive Birdsboro, PA 19508 / US | 02 /
ANTONINI, Joe 3706 Soughton Rd. Collegeville, PA 19246 / US | 03 /
TATASCIORE, James 505 Summit Court Media, PA 19063 / US | 04 /
BONNETT, Raymond E. 1665 Bow Tree Drive West Chester, PA 19380 / US | [2006/17] | Representative(s) | Hazzard, Alan David Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 Munich / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | Hazzard, Alan David Corporate Shared Services C/o Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04782535.1 | 27.08.2004 | [2006/17] | WO2004US28075 | Priority number, date | US20030498946P | 29.08.2003 Original published format: US 498946 P | [2006/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005022353 | Date: | 10.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1649419 | Date: | 26.04.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/00 | [2006/17] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06 (EP,US);
G06Q10/063112 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2006/49] |
Former [2006/17] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KUNDENSERVICE-SUPPORT-SYSTEM | [2006/17] | English: | A CUSTOMER SERVICE SUPPORT SYSTEM | [2006/17] | French: | SYSTEME DE GESTION DE SERVICE CLIENT | [2006/17] | Entry into regional phase | 16.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 16.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/17] | 26.06.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/01] | 16.08.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No Search | International search | [X]US5953405 (MILOSLAVSKY ALEC [US]) |