EP1663202 - SUBSTITUTED INDOLES AS INHIBITORS OF POLY (ADP-RIBOSE) POLYMERASE (PARP) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals Inc. 55 Corporate Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | [2012/03] |
Former [2006/44] | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Somerset Corporate Boulevard Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Aventis Pharmaceuticals, Inc. 300 Somerset Corporate Boulevard Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807-2854 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIANG, John, Z. 5 Lane Road Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | 02 /
KOEHL, Jack, R. 168 Aster Court Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US | 03 /
MEHDI, Shujaath 43 N. 14th Avenue, Apt. 2 Manville, NJ 08835 / US | 04 /
MOORCROFT, Neil 603 Route 173 Bloomsbury, NJ 08804 / US | 05 /
MUSICK, Kwon, Yon 13 Hidden Pond Court Raritan, NJ 08869 / US | 06 /
WEINTRAUB, Philip, M. 33 Casale Drive South Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US | 07 /
EASTWOOD, Paul, R. Calle Palencia,33, 2-1 08191 Rubi, Barcelona / ES | [2006/32] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
JIANG, John, Z. 5 Lane Road Hillsborough, NJ 08844 / US | ||
02 /
KOEHL, Jack, R. 168 Aster Court Whitehouse Station, NJ 08889 / US | |||
03 /
MEHDI, Shujaath 43 N. 14th Avenue, Apt. 2 Manville, NJ 08835 / US | |||
04 /
MOORCROFT, Neil 603 Route 173 Bloomsbury, NJ 08804 / US | |||
05 /
MUSICK, Kwon, Yon 13 Hidden Pond Court Raritan, NJ 08869 / US | |||
06 /
WEINTRAUB, Philip, M. 33 Casale Drive South Warren, New Jersey 07059 / US | |||
07 /
EASTWOOD, Paul, R. Calle Alcalde de Mostoles 7, 4 1 E-08025 Barcelona / ES | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Morel-Pécheux, Muriel Aventis Pharma SA, Direction Brevets, 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92165 Antony Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04782937.9 | 01.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US28543 | Priority number, date | US20030500039P | 04.09.2003 Original published format: US 500039 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023246 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1663202 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/404, A61P9/10, A61K31/541, A61K31/55, A61K31/496, A61K31/454, C07D209/40, C07D401/12, C07D409/04, C07D401/04, C07D471/04, C07D405/12, C07D403/04, C07D401/10, C07D403/10 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C04B35/632 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/404 (EP,US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (EP,US);
A61K31/503 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/541 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D209/40 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/10 (EP,US);
C07D401/12 (EP,US);
C07D403/04 (EP,US);
C07D403/10 (EP,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | 04.04.2006 | HR | 04.04.2006 | LT | 04.04.2006 | LV | 04.04.2006 | MK | 04.04.2006 | Title | German: | SUBSTITUTIERTE INDOLE ALS INHIBITOREN DER POLY (ADP-RIBOSE) POLYMERASE (PARP) | [2006/23] | English: | SUBSTITUTED INDOLES AS INHIBITORS OF POLY (ADP-RIBOSE) POLYMERASE (PARP) | [2006/23] | French: | INDOLES SUBSTITUES COMME INHIBITEURS DE POLYMERASE DE POLY(ADP-RIBOSE) (PARP) | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 18.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE2707268 (HOECHST AG) [X] 22 * page 21 - page 23; examples 32-35 * * page 26 - page 27; example 42; table 3 * * figure III; claim 2 *; | [X]US4148895 (LATTRELL RUDOLF, et al) [X] 22 * column 9 - column 10; table 1 * * claim - *; | [A]WO0185687 (BASF AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-23 * abstract * * example - ** claim - *; | [PX] - BENKLI, KADRIYE ET AL, "Synthesis and antimicrobial activities of some imidazole substituted indoles", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 2004:84341, URL: STN, XP002311566 [PX] 22 * abstract * | [PX] - PLAYER, MARK R. ET AL, "1,3-Oxazino[4,5-b]indole-2,4-(1H,9H)-diones and 5,6- dimethylpyrrolo[2,3-d]-1,3-oxazin-2,4-(1H,7H)-diones as serine protease inhibitors", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS , 4(7), 949-54 CODEN: BMCLE8; ISSN: 0960-894X, (1994), XP002311564 [PX] 22 * page 950 - page 951; examples 4F,G,H; table 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(01)80270-5 | [X] - PLAYER, MARK R. ET AL, "Synthesis of 1,3-disubstituted 2-amino-5-hydroxyindoles by reductive aromatization", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY , 30(1), 125-8 CODEN: JHTCAD; ISSN: 0022-152X, (1993), XP002311565 [X] 22 * page 125; examples I-IV,D * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570300122 |