EP1668565 - METHOD OF EMPLOYING A CHIROGRAPHIC STYLUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 10.10.2012 [2012/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Khomo, Malome T. No 7 Ridgeview Heights 111 Ridge Road Berea 4001, Durban / ZA | [2007/18] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states Khomo, Malome T. 320 Bell Avenue La Grange Illinois 60525 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04783390.0 | 08.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US29117 | Priority number, date | US20030672647 | 26.09.2003 Original published format: US 672647 | US20030520169P | 14.11.2003 Original published format: US 520169 P | US20040542309P | 06.02.2004 Original published format: US 542309 P | US20040552800P | 12.03.2004 Original published format: US 552800 P | US20040840905 | 07.05.2004 Original published format: US 840905 | US20040876314 | 24.06.2004 Original published format: US 876314 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005034022 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1668565 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1668565 | Date: | 17.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06K9/22, G06F3/033 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
G09B11/00 (EP,US);
G06V30/1423 (EP,US);
G09B7/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINES CHIROGRAPHISCHEN STIFTS | [2006/24] | English: | METHOD OF EMPLOYING A CHIROGRAPHIC STYLUS | [2006/24] | French: | PROCEDE D'UTILISATION D'UN STYLET CHIROGRAPHIQUE | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 08.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.08.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 13.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 13.10.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.12.2008 | BE | 17.12.2008 | CY | 17.12.2008 | CZ | 17.12.2008 | DK | 17.12.2008 | EE | 17.12.2008 | FI | 17.12.2008 | IT | 17.12.2008 | NL | 17.12.2008 | PL | 17.12.2008 | RO | 17.12.2008 | SI | 17.12.2008 | SK | 17.12.2008 | TR | 17.12.2008 | BG | 17.03.2009 | SE | 17.03.2009 | GR | 18.03.2009 | ES | 28.03.2009 | PT | 17.05.2009 | HU | 18.06.2009 | GB | 08.09.2009 | IE | 08.09.2009 | LU | 08.09.2009 | [2012/41] |
Former [2011/43] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CY | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IT | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
TR | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
HU | 18.06.2009 | ||
GB | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 08.09.2009 | ||
LU | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IT | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
HU | 18.06.2009 | ||
GB | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 08.09.2009 | ||
LU | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/21] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IT | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
GB | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 08.09.2009 | ||
LU | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
IT | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
GB | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
GB | 08.09.2009 | ||
IE | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
GR | 18.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
IE | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
IE | 08.09.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
DK | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
SK | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 17.12.2008 | |
BE | 17.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 17.12.2008 | ||
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
SE | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
EE | 17.12.2008 | ||
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
RO | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
BG | 17.03.2009 | ||
ES | 28.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 17.12.2008 | |
FI | 17.12.2008 | ||
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 17.12.2008 | |
NL | 17.12.2008 | ||
PL | 17.12.2008 | ||
SI | 17.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3868565 (KUIPERS JACK) [A] 1-23* the whole document *; | [X]US5012049 (SCHIER J ALAN [US]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0762319 (SYMBIOS LOGIC INC [US]) [X] 1-23 * the whole document, in particular col. 3, l. 37-46 *; | [X]US6081261 (WOLFF GREGORY J [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [X]WO0135329 (ITPEN LTD [IL], et al) [X] 1-23 * the whole document, in particular page 21, last paragraph, continued on page 22, first paragraph * |