EP1664798 - NON-PEPTIDE AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS OF ADRENOMEDULLIN AND GASTRIN RELEASING PEPTIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.03.2014 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America as represented by the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services Suite 325, 6011 Executive Boulevard Bethesda, MD 20852 / US | [2013/21] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states The Government of the United States of America, as represented by the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services Suite 325, 6011 Executive Boulevard Bethesda, MD 20852 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CUTTITTA, Frank 7908 Hope Valley Court Adamstown, MD 21710 / US | 02 /
MARTINEZ, Alfredo 5225 Pooks Hill Road Apt. 1614S Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | [2013/21] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
CUTTITTA, Frank 7908 Hope Valley Court Adamstown, MD 21710 / US | ||
02 /
MARTINEZ, Alfredo 5225 Pooks Hill Road, Apt. 1614S Bethesda, MD 20814 / US | Representative(s) | Lord, Hilton David Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Lord, Hilton David Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | ||
Former [2006/23] | Lord, Hilton David Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04783513.7 | 08.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US29293 | Priority number, date | US20030500650P | 08.09.2003 Original published format: US 500650 P | US20040569625P | 11.05.2004 Original published format: US 569625 P | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005026741 | Date: | 24.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/12] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1664798 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664798 | Date: | 22.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/74, A61K31/194, A61K31/4196, A61K31/445, A61K31/4453, A61K31/45, // A61P1/00, A61P17/00, A61P27/02, A61P9/08, A61P9/10, A61P3/10, A61P35/00, A61P9/02 | [2012/36] | CPC: |
A61K31/52 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/194 (EP,US);
A61K31/197 (EP,US);
A61K31/4196 (EP,US);
A61K31/433 (EP,US);
A61K31/439 (EP,US);
A61K31/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/445 (EP,US);
A61K31/4453 (EP,US);
A61K31/45 (EP,US);
A61K38/22 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/02 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
G01N33/68 (US);
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
G01N2333/5758 (EP,US);
G01N2500/04 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/22, A61K2300/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | G01N33/74, A61K31/194, A61K31/4196, A61K31/445, A61K31/4453, A61K31/45, A61P9/08, A61P9/10, A61P3/10, A61P35/00, A61P9/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | NICHT PEPTIDISCHE AGONISTEN UND ANTAGONISTEN VON ADRENOMEDULLIN UND GASTRIN FREISETZENDE PEPTIDE | [2006/23] | English: | NON-PEPTIDE AGONISTS AND ANTAGONISTS OF ADRENOMEDULLIN AND GASTRIN RELEASING PEPTIDE | [2006/23] | French: | AGONISTES ET ANTAGONISTES NON PEPTIDIQUES D'ADRENOMEDULLINE ET PEPTIDE DE LIBERATION GASTRIQUE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 27.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.07.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2012 | 17.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.11.2012 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 12.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP11000695.4 / EP2339351 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 08.09.2004 | AT | 22.05.2013 | BE | 22.05.2013 | CY | 22.05.2013 | CZ | 22.05.2013 | DK | 22.05.2013 | EE | 22.05.2013 | FI | 22.05.2013 | IT | 22.05.2013 | MC | 22.05.2013 | NL | 22.05.2013 | PL | 22.05.2013 | RO | 22.05.2013 | SE | 22.05.2013 | SI | 22.05.2013 | SK | 22.05.2013 | TR | 22.05.2013 | BG | 22.08.2013 | GR | 23.08.2013 | ES | 02.09.2013 | GB | 08.09.2013 | IE | 08.09.2013 | LU | 08.09.2013 | PT | 23.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2016/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 08.09.2004 | |
AT | 22.05.2013 | ||
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
TR | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 08.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
LU | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
TR | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 08.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CY | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 08.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
GB | 08.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
IE | 08.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
MC | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
NL | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
IT | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
RO | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
CZ | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SK | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
DK | 22.05.2013 | ||
EE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
BE | 22.05.2013 | ||
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
PL | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
BG | 22.08.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
FI | 22.05.2013 | ||
SE | 22.05.2013 | ||
SI | 22.05.2013 | ||
GR | 23.08.2013 | ||
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 22.05.2013 | |
ES | 02.09.2013 | ||
PT | 23.09.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 23.09.2013 | Cited in | International search | [X]FR2241313 (SANDOZ SA [CH]) [X] 9,10,53,54 * claims 1,13,14 *; | [A]WO9707214 (US GOV HEALTH & HUMAN SERV [US], et al) [A] 1-4,9-28,47,48,51-54,57,58,61 * abstract *; | [X]WO9905299 (UNIV BOSTON [US]) [X] 9,10,35-37,55,56,61 * claims 16,27,40 *; | [X]WO0030630 (LINDEN BIOTECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [X] 9,10,35-37,55,56,61 * figure 1; claim 9 *; | [A]EP0806418 (NIPPON SHOJI KAISHA LIMITED [JP]) [A] 49,59,66-75 * abstract * | [X] - LOOKER, J. H. ET AL, "1,2,3-Thiadiazoles as potential antineoplastic agents. I. Synthesis of novel 4-monosubstituted and 4,5-disubstituted derivatives Physiologically active compounds. III. Hydrochlorides of amino esters of phenylcyclohexylglycolic acids, of amides of benzilic, phenylcyclohexyl- and dicyclohexylglycolic,", JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY , 2(4), 348-54 CODEN: JHTCAD; ISSN: 0022-152X, (1965), XP002314287 [X] 9,10,17-19,53,54 * page 352, column L, line 6 - line 12; table I * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jhet.5570020405 | [X] - TMEJ C ET AL, "A COMBINED HANSCH/FREE-WILSON APPROACH AS PREDICTIVE TOOL IN QSAR STUDIES ON PROPAFENONE-TYPE MODULATORS OF MULTIDRUG RESISTANCE", ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, VCH VERLAGSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, WEINHEIM, DE, (1998), vol. 331, no. 7/8, ISSN 0365-6233, pages 233 - 240, XP000881287 [X] 9,10,17-19,53,54 * abstract; page 233, left-hand column, first paragraph; tables 1-2; figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1521-4184(199807)331:7/8<233::AID-ARDP233>3.3.CO;2-U | [X] - MURAD S ET AL, "STRUCTURE-ACTIVITY RELATIONSHIP OF MINOXIDIL ANALOGS AS INHIBITORS OF LYSYL HYDROXYLASE IN CULTURED FIBROBLASTS1", ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, NEW YORK, US, US, (1992), vol. 292, no. 1, ISSN 0003-9861, pages 234 - 238, XP000564071 [X] 9,10,53,54 * abstract; table I; page 237, paragraph joining left- and right-hand columns; paragraph joining pages 237 and 238 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0003-9861(92)90073-6 | [X] - EAKIN A E ET AL, "COMPARATIVE COMPLEMENT SELECTION IN BACTERIA ENABLES SCREENING FOR LEAD COMPOUNDS TARGETED TO A PURINE SALVAGE ENZYME OF PARASITES", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (199503), vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 620 - 625, XP001055590 [X] 9,10,53,54 * abstract * | [PX] - MARTÍNEZ A ET AL, "Identification of vasoactive nonpeptidic positive and negative modulators of adrenomedullin using a neutralizing antibody-based screening strategy", ENDOCRINOLOGY 2004 UNITED STATES, (200408), vol. 145, no. 8, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 3858 - 3865, XP009042699 [PX] 1-75 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.2003-1251 | [PX] - GASPARETTO M ET AL, "Identification of compounds that enhance the anti-lymphoma activity of rituximab using flow cytometric high-content screening", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (200409), vol. 292, no. 1-2, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 59 - 71, XP004550500 [PX] 9,10,20-28,53,54 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2004.06.003 | [A] - EGUCHI SATORU ET AL, "Structure-activity relationship of adrenomedullin, a novel vasodilatory peptide, in cultured rat vascular smooth muscle cells", ENDOCRINOLOGY, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (1994), vol. 135, no. 6, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 2454 - 2458, XP002193142 [A] 1-4,9-28,47,48,51-54,57,58,61 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/en.135.6.2454 | [A] - AMIR S M ET AL, "POLYPHLORETIN PHOSPHATE AN ANTAGONIST OF THYROTROPIN ACTION EVIDENCE FOR AN INTERACTION WITH THE HORMONE RATHER THAN THE RECEPTOR", ENDOCRINOLOGY, (1985), vol. 117, no. 3, ISSN 0013-7227, pages 860 - 868, XP009042800 [A] * abstract * | [A] - HEUSER MARKUS ET AL, "The inhibition of angiogenesis and microcirculation in renal cell carcinoma spheroids by gastrin releasing peptide receptor (GRP-R) antagonism depends on the time of treatment initiation.", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, & 98TH ANNUAL MEETING OF THE AMERICAN UROLOGICAL ASSOCIATION (AUA); CHICAGO, IL, USA; APRIL 26-MAY 02, 2003, (200304), vol. 169, no. 4 Supplement, ISSN 0022-5347, page 207, XP009042804 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/01.ju.0000051222.09122.54 | [X] - CHERNOV, V. A. ET AL, "Antiblastomic activity of sydnone imines", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, (1964), Database accession no. 1964:406942, URL: STN, XP002331366 [X] 9,10,35-37,55,56,61 * abstract * | [X] - DAENIKER, H. U. ET AL, "Chemotherapeutic studies in the heterocyclic series. XVIII. Polymethylenedi(sydnones) and polymethylenedi(hydrazines)", HELVETICA CHIMICA ACTA , 40, 918-32 CODEN: HCACAV; ISSN: 0018-019X, (1957), XP009048688 [X] 9,10,35-37,55,56,61 * compound IVa on page 920; last paragraph (foot notes) on page 925 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/hlca.19570400406 | [X] - THOMAS F ET AL, "ANTITUMORAL ACTIVITY OF BOMBESIN ANALOGUE ON SMALL CELL LUNG CANCER XENOGRAFTS RELATIONSHIP WITH BOMBESIN RECEPTOR EXPRESSION", CANCER RESEARCH, (1992), vol. 52, no. 18, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 4872 - 4877, XP001206441 [X] 65 * abstract * | [PX] - BAJO A M ET AL, "BOMBESIN ANTAGONISTS INHIBIT PROANGIOGENIC FACTORS IN HUMAN EXPERIMENTAL BREAST CANCERS", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, LONDON, GB, (20040112), vol. 90, no. 1, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 245 - 252, XP001183666 [PX] 62-65 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.bjc.6601404 | [A] - CUTTITTA F ET AL, "BOMBESIN-LIKE PEPTIDES CAN FUNCTION AS AUTOCRINE GROWTH FACTORS IN HUMAN SMALL-CELL LUNG CANCER", NATURE (LONDON), (1985), vol. 316, no. 6031, ISSN 0028-0836, pages 823 - 826, XP001206814 [A] 5-8,29-46,49-52,55,56,59-61 * page 823, right-hand column, second paragraph; page 824, left-hand column, second paragraph; figure 3; page 826, left-hand column, lines 1-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/316823a0 | [A] - ASHWOOD V ET AL, "PD 176252 - The First High Affinity Non-peptide Gastrin-Releasing Peptide (BB2) Receptor Antagonist", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, OXFORD, GB, (19980922), vol. 8, no. 18, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 2589 - 2594, XP004138276 [A] 5-8,29-46,49-52,55,56,59-61 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0960-894X(98)00462-4 | by applicant | FR2241313 | - LOOKER JH ET AL., JOURNAL OF HETEROCYCLIC CHEMISTRY, (1965), vol. 2, no. 4, pages 348 - 354 | - TMEJ C ET AL., ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, (1998), vol. 331, no. 7/8, pages 233 - 240 | - MURAD S ET AL., ARCHIVES OF BIOCHEMISTRY AND BIOPHYSICS, (1992), vol. 292, no. 1, pages 234 - 238 | - EAKIN AE ET AL., ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (1995), vol. 39, no. 3, pages 620 - 625 | - MARTINEZ A ET AL., ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2004), vol. 145, no. 8, pages 3858 - 3865 | - NAKAJIMA; ANSELME, J. ORG. CHEM., (1983), vol. 48, pages 1444 - 1448 |