EP1695169 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INCREMENTAL CODE SIGNING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states APPLE INC. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | [2014/47] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Apple Inc. 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states APPLE COMPUTER, INC. M/S 38-PAT, 1 Infinite Loop Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIEHTREIBER, Perry 1509 Walnut Drive Campbell, CA 95008 / US | 02 /
BROUWER, Michael 141 Red River Way San Jose, CA 95136 / US | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Howell, Matthew Dafydd, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [2014/47] |
Former [2011/35] | Howell, Matthew Dafydd, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2009/49] | Barnfather, Karl Jon, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | ||
Former [2006/35] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside L41 6B / GB | Application number, filing date | 04783639.0 | 10.09.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004US29470 | Priority number, date | US20030666847 | 18.09.2003 Original published format: US 666847 | [2006/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005029223 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1695169 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1695169 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/36, H04L9/32, G06F21/64, G06F21/50 | [2014/23] | CPC: |
H04L9/50 (EP,US);
G06F21/50 (US);
G06F21/54 (EP,US);
H04L9/3239 (EP,US);
H04L9/3247 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2006/46] | H04L9/36 | ||
Former IPC [2006/35] | G06F1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR INKREMENTELLEN CODESIGNIERUNG | [2006/35] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR INCREMENTAL CODE SIGNING | [2006/35] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE SIGNER UN CODE DE MANIERE INCREMENTIELLE | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Search fee paid | 11.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.01.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 27.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 19.04.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13169962.1 / EP2634959 | EP13169965.4 / EP2634960 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2004 | AT | 19.11.2014 | BE | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | ES | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | IT | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | NL | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | SE | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | GR | 20.02.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 10.09.2004 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
IT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
ES | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
SE | 19.11.2014 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | ES | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
NL | 19.11.2014 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | PT | 19.03.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO0049764 (SUN MICROSYSTEMS INC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 4, line 2 *; | [Y]US6263348 (KATHROW BODIE [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * column 2, lines 29-61 * * column 3, line 57 - column 5, line 42 * * column 9, line 66 - column 10, line 29 * * figures 2,3 *; | [A]US2001034839 (KARJOTH GUENTER [CH], et al) [A] 1-20 * abstract ** paragraphs [0001] - [0036] * | International search | [X]EP0752786 (THOMSON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS [US]); | [A]WO0163385 (NCIPHER CORP LTD [GB], et al); | [A]WO0241147 (DIGITAL TRANSIT [US], et al); | [Y]US2002194484 (BOLOSKY WILLIAM J [US], et al); | [Y] - SCHNEIER B., Applied Cryptography, Second Edition: Protocols, Algorithms, and Source Code in C, (1996), pages 442 - 445, XP000619791 | Examination | - BELLARE M ET AL, "Incremental cryptography: the case of hashing and signing", ADVANCES IN CRYPTOLOGY (CRYPTO). SANTA BARBARA, AUG. 21 - 25, 1994; [PROCEEDINGS OF THE ANNUAL INTERNATIONAL CRYPTOLOGY CONFERENCE (CRYPTO)], BERLIN, SPRINGER, DE, (19940821), ISBN 978-3-540-58333-2, pages 216 - 233, XP007913027 | by applicant | US6263348 | - "Incremental Cryptography: The Case of Hashing and Signing", BELLARE, Advances in Cryptology (Crypto, SPRINGER, (19940821), pages 216 - 233 |