EP1667814 - TUBE MILLING HEAD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H & S Tool, Inc. P.O. Box 393 Wadsworth, Ohio 44282 / US | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALL, J., Randall 938 Longbrook Drive Wadsworth, OH 44281 / US | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Bahnhofstraße 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Mehler Achler Patentanwälte Bahnhofstraße 67 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2011/51] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/28] | Fuchs Patentanwälte Postfach 46 60 65036 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Fuchs Mehler Weiss & Fritzsche Patentanwälte Söhnleinstrasse 8 D-65201 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 04783660.6 | 09.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US29506 | Priority number, date | US20030657890 | 09.09.2003 Original published format: US 657890 | US20030721539 | 25.11.2003 Original published format: US 721539 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005023483 | Date: | 17.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667814 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1667814 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/28, B23C3/00, B23B41/00 | [2010/26] | CPC: |
B23B5/168 (EP,KR,US);
B23C3/007 (KR);
B23C9/005 (KR);
B23B2210/02 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T407/1906 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1936 (EP,US);
Y10T407/1946 (EP,US);
Y10T407/22 (EP,US);
Y10T407/2202 (EP,US);
Y10T409/304144 (EP,US);
Y10T409/30952 (EP,US);
Y10T82/16 (EP,US);
Y10T82/22 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | B23P15/28, B23C3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | 14.03.2006 | HR | 14.03.2006 | LT | 14.03.2006 | LV | 14.03.2006 | MK | 14.03.2006 | Title | German: | ROHRFRÄSKOPF | [2006/24] | English: | TUBE MILLING HEAD | [2006/24] | French: | TETE POUR FRAISAGE DE TUBES | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 29.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.06.2011 | 09.06.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 30.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2010 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.09.2004 | AT | 21.12.2011 | BE | 21.12.2011 | CY | 21.12.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | DK | 21.12.2011 | EE | 21.12.2011 | FI | 21.12.2011 | IT | 21.12.2011 | NL | 21.12.2011 | PL | 21.12.2011 | PT | 21.12.2011 | RO | 21.12.2011 | SE | 21.12.2011 | SI | 21.12.2011 | SK | 21.12.2011 | TR | 21.12.2011 | BG | 21.03.2012 | GR | 22.03.2012 | ES | 01.04.2012 | GB | 09.09.2012 | IE | 09.09.2012 | LU | 09.09.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
GB | 09.09.2012 | ||
IE | 09.09.2012 | ||
LU | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
GB | 09.09.2012 | ||
IE | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
GB | 09.09.2012 | ||
IE | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
IE | 09.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
ES | 01.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
BE | 21.12.2011 | ||
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
IT | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/30] | BE | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | NL | 21.12.2011 | |
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US4691600 (CARLSON LARRY M [US], et al) [I] 1-23 * figure 6 *; | [XAI]US5356248 (HILLESTAD MARK W [US]) [X] 14 * the whole document * [A] 2-13,15-23[I] 1; | [I]US6533506 (HITE KEVIN E [US]) [I] 1-23 * figures 12,19 * * the whole document *; | [I]US2003113176 (KRESS DIETER [DE]) [I] 1-23 * figure - * | International search | [X]US5542177 (HILLESTAD MARK W [US]); | [A]US4449871 (HILLESTAD TOLLIEF O [US]); | [A]US4601222 (GILL WILLIAM A [GB]); | [A]US4830551 (BRENNAN MATTHEW T [US], et al); | [A]US4872249 (VANDERPOL JERALD [US], et al); | [A]US4889454 (HILLESTAD TOLLIEF O [US], et al); | [A]US5314270 (LAVANCHY WAYNE N [US], et al) | by applicant | US5542177 |