EP1663083 - SHOULDER SLING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.04.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 07.05.2008 [2008/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states dj Orthopedics, LLC 2985 Scott Street Vista, CA 92083-8339 / US | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAZMIERCZAK, Andy 3504 Windrift Way Oceanside, CA 92056 / US | 02 /
SNYDER, Stephen, J., M.D. 6815 Noble Avenue Van Nuys, CA 91405 / US | 03 /
MCCARTY, Eric, M.D. 517 Indian Peaks Trail West Lafayette, Colorado 80026 / US | 04 /
GREGERSEN, Colin, S. 2151-A Montgomery Avenue Cardiff, CA 92007 / US | 05 /
HALCHUK, Nancy 1025 Orleavo Drive Vista, CA 92084 / US | 06 /
CESENA, Alfredo Bahia de Todos los Santos 667, El Mirador c.p. Tijuana, B.C. 22230 / MX | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | Bobzien, Hans Christoph Lippert Stachow Patentanwälte Rechtanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | Bobzien, Hans Christoph Lippert, Stachow & Partner Patentanwälte Frankenforster Strasse 135-137 51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE | Application number, filing date | 04783985.7 | 13.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US29976 | Priority number, date | US20030663381 | 15.09.2003 Original published format: US 663381 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005027805 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1663083 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61F5/37 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
A61F5/3753 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHULTERSCHLINGE | [2006/23] | English: | SHOULDER SLING | [2006/23] | French: | ECHARPE POUR EPAULE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 28.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/19] | 30.12.2007 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]EP0904752 (HABERMEYER PETER PROF DR MED [DE]) [X] 1,4,15-17,22 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0037]; figures 1,3 * [Y] 18; | [Y]FR2771625 (KINWORK [FR]) [Y] 18 * figure 1 *; | [A]US5334132 (BURKHEAD WAYNE Z [US]) [A] 1,16 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 22; figures 1-3,7,8 * |