EP1663771 - MOLDED PLASTIC GANGWAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-Z Dock, Inc. 878 Highway 60, P.O. Box 420 Monett, MO 65708 / US | [2006/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSTRENG, Troy 251 South Elk Valley Drive Nixa, MO 65714 / US | 02 /
MOODY, Larry 1420 West Skyline Ozark, Missouri 65721 / US | [2007/17] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
OSTRENG, Troy 251 South Elk Valley Drive Nixa, MO 65714 / US | ||
02 /
MOODY, Larry 114B Aubree Court Monett, MO 65708 / US | Representative(s) | Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [2012/47] |
Former [2008/45] | Dorschner, David, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2006/23] | Weydert, Robert, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 04784501.1 | 20.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004US30650 | Priority number, date | US20030665968 | 18.09.2003 Original published format: US 665968 | [2006/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005028192 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1663771 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1663771 | Date: | 01.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.06.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B63B17/00, B63B27/14 | [2011/27] | CPC: |
B63B27/14 (EP,US);
E01D15/24 (EP);
E02B3/064 (EP,US);
B63B2231/40 (EP,US);
E01D2101/40 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | B63B17/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Title | German: | GEFORMTE KUNSTSTOFFGANGWAY | [2006/23] | English: | MOLDED PLASTIC GANGWAY | [2006/23] | French: | PASSERELLE EN PLASTIQUE MOULE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 17.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 30.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.01.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 08.01.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.03.2012 | Opposition(s) | 04.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.09.2004 | CY | 01.05.2013 | EE | 01.05.2013 | MC | 01.05.2013 | RO | 01.05.2013 | SI | 01.05.2013 | SK | 01.05.2013 | BG | 01.08.2013 | GR | 02.08.2013 | AT | 20.09.2013 | CZ | 20.09.2013 | LU | 20.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/12] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
AT | 20.09.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
CZ | 20.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
MC | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
RO | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
EE | 01.05.2013 | ||
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
SK | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 01.05.2013 | |
SI | 01.05.2013 | ||
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | SI | 01.05.2013 | |
BG | 01.08.2013 | ||
GR | 02.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 01.05.2013 | |
GR | 02.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [X]US6179525 (GRUHN RYAN B [US], et al); | [Y]US4799445 (MERIWETHER JON D [US]); | [Y]US5247899 (BOESSER SARA L [US]) | by applicant | US6179525 |