EP1668047 - PLURAL ELEMENT COMPOSITE MATERIALS, METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Segan Industries, Inc. P.O. Box 367 Burlingame, CA 94011-0367 / US | [2006/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIBI, Hans, O. P.O. Box 367 Burlingame, CA 94011-0367 / US | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Bavariaring 17 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Duxbury, Stephen, et al Arnold & Siedsma Isartorplatz 5 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04784522.7 | 17.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US30675 | Priority number, date | US20030504180P | 17.09.2003 Original published format: US 504180 P | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005028524 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1668047 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C08F20/00, C08K5/00, C08G18/22, B29C61/00, B29C61/06 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
G02F1/0072 (EP,US);
B32B37/14 (US);
C08L75/04 (EP,US);
G02F1/0147 (EP,US);
B29C61/00 (EP,US);
B29K2995/0018 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | C08F20/00, C08K5/00, C08G18/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRELEMENT-VERBUNDWERKSTOFFE, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2006/24] | English: | PLURAL ELEMENT COMPOSITE MATERIALS, METHODS FOR MAKING AND USING THE SAME | [2006/24] | French: | MATERIAU COMPOSITE EN PLUSIEURS ELEMENTS ET SES PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 02.06.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP2002006280 ; | [X]US4344909 (DE BLAUWE FRANCIS J A M C) [X] 1-11 * claim 1 *; | [X]US4667869 (GEN TAMAR G [US], et al) [X] 1-11* column 5, line 30 - line 50 *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, no. 28, Database accession no. 2002-221574, XP002535493 & JP2002006280 A 20020109 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEM INC) [X] 1-11 * abstract * | International search | [X]US5208132 (KAMADA MASAYASU [JP], et al); | [X]EP0353650 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]); | [Y]US5895718 (ISHIMURA NAOYA [JP], et al); | [A]JPH041196 (ENICHEM SINTESI); | [Y]JPH1017622 (AKASHI MITSURU, et al) |