EP1697992 - SIDEWALL FORMATION FOR HIGH DENSITY POLYMER MEMORY ELEMENT ARRAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cypress Semiconductor Corporation 198 Champion Court San Jose, CA 95134-1709 / US | [2015/44] |
Former [2007/45] | For all designated states Spansion LLC 915 DeGuigne Drive P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088-3453 / US | ||
Former [2007/44] | For all designated states Spansion, Inc 915 DeGuigne Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94088-3453 / US | ||
Former [2006/36] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. One AMD Place, Mail Stop 68, P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale California 94088-3453 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LYONS, Christopher, F. 42681 Lerwick Street Freemont, CA 94539 / US | 02 /
CHANG, Mark, S. 1881 Farndon Avenue Los Altos, CA 94024 / US | 03 /
LOPATIN, Sergey, D. 1000 Kiely Blvd. 66 Santa Clara, CA 95051 / US | 04 /
SUBRAMANIAN, Ramkumar 1155-D La Rochelle Terrace Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US | 05 /
CHEUNG, Patrick 561 Cherrywood Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 06 /
NGO, Minh, Van 40986 Canyon Heights Drive Fremont, CA 94539 / US | 07 /
OGLESBY, Jane, V. 264 N. Whisman Road 18 Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2006/36] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/36] | Brookes Batchellor LLP 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04784925.2 | 23.09.2004 | [2006/36] | WO2004US31275 | Priority number, date | US20030699903 | 03.11.2003 Original published format: US 699903 | [2006/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005045935 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1697992 | Date: | 06.09.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/115 | [2006/36] | CPC: |
G11C11/5664 (EP,KR,US);
B82Y10/00 (EP,KR,US);
G11C13/0014 (EP,KR,US);
G11C13/0016 (EP,KR,US);
H01L21/3213 (KR);
H10K10/701 (EP,KR,US);
H10K19/202 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/06] |
Former [2006/36] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SEITENWAND-AUSBILDUNG FÜR EIN DICHTES POLYMER-SPEICHERELEMENT-ARRAY | [2006/36] | English: | SIDEWALL FORMATION FOR HIGH DENSITY POLYMER MEMORY ELEMENT ARRAY | [2006/36] | French: | FORMATION SUR PAROI LATERALE POUR RESEAU DE POINTS MEMOIRE POLYMERIQUES HAUTE DENSITE | [2006/36] | Entry into regional phase | 19.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/36] | 15.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/13] | 20.11.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.09.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.09.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2015 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   30.11.2015 | 30.09.2017 | 14   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US6501134 (KRIVOKAPIC ZORAN [US]); | [A]US6528815 (BROWN ADAM R [NL], et al); | [A]US6545891 (TRINGALI J JAMES [US], et al); | [XY]WO03032392 (AXON TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US], et al); | [Y]US2003173612 (KRIEGER JURI H [US], et al) | Examination | WO2004109803 | EP1629535 |