EP1678383 - TOILETS WITH QUICK FLUSH TRAPWAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.03.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KOHLER CO. 444 Highland Drive Kohler, WI 53044 / US | [2006/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KURU, William, C. W6268 Hill and Dale Road Plymouth, WI 53073 / US | 02 /
KRISHNAMURTY, Venkata, S. N6764 Cardinal Drive Sheboygan, WI 53083 / US | 03 /
HALLORAN, Daniel, N. 623 Shady Glen Lane Saukville, WI 53080 / US | 04 /
LIU, Patrick, Ying-Te 491 Tanager Drive Grafton, WI 53024 / US | 05 /
MUKERJI, Sudip W53 N863 Castle Court Cedarburg, WI 53012 / US | [2007/25] |
Former [2006/28] | 01 /
KURU, William, C. W6268 Hill and Dale Road Plymouth, WI 53073 / US | ||
02 /
KRISHNAMURTY, Venkata, S. N6764 Cardinal Drive Sheboygan, WI 53083 / US | |||
03 /
HALLORAN, Daniel, N. 623 Shady Glen Lane Saukville, WI 53080 / US | |||
04 /
LIU, Patrick, Ying-Te 1327 North 49th Street Sheboygan, WI 53081 / US | |||
05 /
MUKERJI, Sudip W53 N863 Castle Court Cedarburg, WI 53012 / US | Representative(s) | Wightman, David Alexander, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/18] | Wightman, David Alexander, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/28] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al LADAS & PARRY LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04785089.6 | 28.09.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004US31575 | Priority number, date | US20030678362 | 03.10.2003 Original published format: US 678362 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005033423 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1678383 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.07.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E03D11/00 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
E03D11/18 (EP,US);
E03D11/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TOILETTEN MIT SCHNELLSPÜLSIPHONEN | [2006/28] | English: | TOILETS WITH QUICK FLUSH TRAPWAYS | [2006/28] | French: | W.-C. A SIPHON D'EVACUATION RAPIDE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 13.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/16] | 30.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.06.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE29807813U (TOP VALVE CO [TW]) [X] 1 * figures 1,2 * [I] 2-18; | [A]US5918325 (ARITA KINYA [JP], et al) [A] 1-18* figure 4 *; | [XI]US6115853 (SHIBATA SHINJI [JP], et al) [X] 1 * figures 41,46,50 * [I] 2-18; | [XP]US2004040080 (PROKOPENKO ALEKSANDR V [US], et al) [XP] 1 * figure 1 * | International search | [X]US1067096 (COCHRAN ANDREW [US]); | [Y]US4173800 (FLEGEL GEORGE J [US], et al); | [X]US5819326 (KOBAYASHI HIROSHI [JP], et al) |