EP1671230 - EFFICIENT SYSTEM MANAGEMENT SYNCHRONIZATION AND MEMORY ALLOCATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/28] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, California 95052 / US | ||
Former [2006/25] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, California 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COOPER, Barnes 16425 SW Cornelian Way Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | 02 /
KOBAYASHI, Grant 94-386 Alapoai Street Millilani, HI 96789 / US | [2006/25] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/44] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/25] | Goddar, Heinz J. Forrester & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 D-80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04785380.9 | 06.10.2004 | [2006/25] | WO2004US33069 | Priority number, date | US20030680615 | 06.10.2003 Original published format: US 680615 | [2006/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005036398 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1671230 | Date: | 21.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1671230 | Date: | 14.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F9/46, G06F1/32 | [2006/25] | CPC: |
G06F12/0284 (EP,US);
G06F9/46 (KR);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F13/20 (KR);
G06F15/16 (EP,US);
G06F9/5016 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/25] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EFFIZIENTE SYSTEMVERWALTUNGSSYNCHRONISATION UND SPEICHERZUTEILUNG | [2006/25] | English: | EFFICIENT SYSTEM MANAGEMENT SYNCHRONIZATION AND MEMORY ALLOCATION | [2006/25] | French: | SYNCHRONISATION DE GESTION DE SYSTEME ET ALLOCATION DE MEMOIRE EFFICACES | [2006/25] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/25] | 14.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.11.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.12.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 22.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP09014418.9 / EP2230600 | Opposition(s) | 15.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.07.2010 | BE | 14.07.2010 | CY | 14.07.2010 | CZ | 14.07.2010 | DK | 14.07.2010 | EE | 14.07.2010 | FI | 14.07.2010 | IT | 14.07.2010 | NL | 14.07.2010 | PL | 14.07.2010 | RO | 14.07.2010 | SE | 14.07.2010 | SI | 14.07.2010 | SK | 14.07.2010 | TR | 14.07.2010 | IE | 06.10.2010 | LU | 06.10.2010 | BG | 14.10.2010 | GB | 14.10.2010 | GR | 15.10.2010 | ES | 25.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | FR | 02.11.2010 | PT | 15.11.2010 | HU | 15.01.2011 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LU | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GB | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
HU | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GB | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
HU | 15.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GB | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/43] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GB | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
IT | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
RO | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
ES | 25.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
EE | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
SK | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
DK | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
BE | 14.07.2010 | ||
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SE | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
GR | 15.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
CY | 14.07.2010 | ||
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
FI | 14.07.2010 | ||
NL | 14.07.2010 | ||
PL | 14.07.2010 | ||
SI | 14.07.2010 | ||
BG | 14.10.2010 | ||
PT | 15.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 14.07.2010 | |
NL | 14.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO02093375 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-19,43-52 * page 8, line 17 - page 9, line 10 * * page 16, lines 16-27 *; | [A]WO03044665 (INTEL CORP [US]) [A] 1-19,43-52* page 10, line 26 - page 12, line 19 *; | [X] - ANONYMOUS, "IA-32 Intel Architecture Software Developer's Manual, Volume 3: System Programming Guide", INTERNET ARTICLE, (1999), URL: http://developer.intel.com/design/pentiumii/manuals/24319202.pdf, (20050106), XP002312735 [X] 20-42,53-58 * page 12.1, lines 8-34 * * page 12.4, line 1 - page 12.7, line 11 * * page 12.17, lines 6-14 * | Examination | US5781187 |