EP1707031 - HEARING AID FOR PEOPLE HARD OF HEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2013 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SCHLEGEL, Udo D. Zum Sundern 8 38527 Meine / DE | [2006/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2006/40] | Representative(s) | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/29] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/40] | Klunker . Schmitt-Nilson . Hirsch Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04786997.9 | 23.09.2004 | [2006/40] | WO2004EP10702 | Priority number, date | DE2003144032 | 23.09.2003 Original published format: DE 10344032 | [2006/40] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005029918 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1707031 | Date: | 04.10.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1707031 | Date: | 18.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 31.03.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04R25/04 | [2006/40] | CPC: |
H04R25/552 (EP);
H04R25/04 (EP);
H04R25/554 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/40] | Title | German: | HÖRSYSTEM FÜR SCHWERHÖRIGE PERSONEN | [2011/29] | English: | HEARING AID FOR PEOPLE HARD OF HEARING | [2006/40] | French: | SYSTEME AUDITIF POUR DES PERSONNES MALENTENDANTES | [2011/29] |
Former [2006/40] | HÖRSYSTEM VERWENDBAR FÜR SCHWERHÖRIGE PERSONEN | ||
Former [2006/40] | SYSTEME AUDITIF POUVANT ETRE UTILISE PAR DES PERSONNES MALENTENDANTES | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.07.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 09.08.2006 | Examination requested [2006/40] | 28.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 25.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 19.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/26] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.10.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 25.10.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 10.11.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 09.08.2006 | AT   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | BG   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | CH   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | CY   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | CZ   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | DK   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | EE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | FI   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | GR   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | HU   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | IE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | LU   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | MC   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | PL   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | PT   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | RO   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | SI   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | SK   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | 09.08.2006 | TR   M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 09.08.2006 | M01   Fee paid on   09.08.2006 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2011 | 30.09.2011 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   30.03.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.09.2004 | CY | 18.07.2012 | CZ | 18.07.2012 | DK | 18.07.2012 | EE | 18.07.2012 | FI | 18.07.2012 | IT | 18.07.2012 | NL | 18.07.2012 | PL | 18.07.2012 | RO | 18.07.2012 | SE | 18.07.2012 | SI | 18.07.2012 | SK | 18.07.2012 | TR | 18.07.2012 | AT | 23.09.2012 | IE | 23.09.2012 | LU | 23.09.2012 | BE | 30.09.2012 | CH | 30.09.2012 | LI | 30.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | FR | 01.10.2012 | BG | 18.10.2012 | GB | 18.10.2012 | GR | 19.10.2012 | ES | 29.10.2012 | PT | 19.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
AT | 23.09.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
LU | 23.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
TR | 18.07.2012 | ||
AT | 23.09.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
AT | 23.09.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/46] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
ES | 29.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/40] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
FR | 01.10.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
BG | 18.10.2012 | ||
GB | 18.10.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
IE | 23.09.2012 | ||
BE | 30.09.2012 | ||
CH | 30.09.2012 | ||
LI | 30.09.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
IT | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
RO | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
SK | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
CZ | 18.07.2012 | ||
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
EE | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
DK | 18.07.2012 | ||
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
NL | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
PT | 19.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SE | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
PL | 18.07.2012 | ||
SI | 18.07.2012 | ||
GR | 19.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 18.07.2012 | |
FI | 18.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 18.07.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS5592100 ; | [XY]EP0723381 (POETSCH MARKUS) [X] 1,5-17,20-24,26,28-37 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4,18,19,25,27,38; | [Y]US6387039 (MOSES RON L) [Y] 2-4 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 38 *; | [Y]US4852177 (AMBROSE STEPHEN D) [Y] 2-4 * column 1, line 5 - column 2, line 12 * * column 5, line 27 - line 50 *; | [Y]US5887070 (WILSON DONALD L ET AL) [Y] 2-4 * column 1, line 12 - line 59 * * column 3, line 2 - line 6 *; | [Y]US6041129 (ADELMAN ROGER A) [Y] 2-4,18,19,25,27 * column 4, line 21 - line 29 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 18 * * column 12, line 31 - line 51 * * column 17, line 19 - line 63 *; | [Y]DE10147812 (SIEMENS AUDIOLOGISCHE TECHNIK) [Y] 38 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19801004), vol. 004, no. 141, Database accession no. (E - 028), & JP55092100 A 19800712 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1,35 * abstract * |