EP1664234 - HYDROFLUOROCARBON-BASED COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2007/40] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Arkema France 4-8, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | ||
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states Arkema 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GUILPAIN, Gérard 19, Route de la Joanna F-69126 Brindas / FR | 02 /
CARON, Laurent 4, Chemin du Signal 69110 Sainte Foy Les Lyon / FR | [2007/22] |
Former [2006/23] | 01 /
GUILPAIN, Gérard 105, chemin du Soyard F-69126 Brindas / FR | ||
02 /
CARON, Laurent 10, rue Jean-Marie Leclair F-69009 Lyon / FR | Representative(s) | Dang, Doris, et al ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Dang, Doris, et al ARKEMA France Département Propriété Industrielle 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2006/46] | Dang, Doris, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense / FR | ||
Former [2006/23] | Dang, Doris ARKEMA Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8, cours Michelet, La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 04787286.6 | 02.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004FR02231 | Priority number, date | FR20030011025 | 19.09.2003 Original published format: FR 0311025 | [2006/23] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005028586 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/13] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1664234 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1664234 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/04 | [2006/23] | CPC: |
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
F25B2400/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/23] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDROFLUORCARBONBASIERTE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG | [2006/23] | English: | HYDROFLUOROCARBON-BASED COMPOSITION AND USE THEREOF | [2006/23] | French: | COMPOSITION A BASE D HFC (HYDROFLUOROCARBURES) ET SON UTILISATION | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 16.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 16.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 18.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP08171320.8 / EP2031033 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/46] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 24.02.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 09.12.2009 | CY | 09.12.2009 | CZ | 09.12.2009 | DK | 09.12.2009 | EE | 09.12.2009 | FI | 09.12.2009 | IE | 09.12.2009 | PL | 09.12.2009 | RO | 09.12.2009 | SE | 09.12.2009 | SI | 09.12.2009 | SK | 09.12.2009 | TR | 09.12.2009 | BG | 09.03.2010 | GR | 10.03.2010 | PT | 09.04.2010 | HU | 10.06.2010 | LU | 02.09.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
LU | 02.09.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
HU | 10.06.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
DK | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CY | 09.12.2009 | ||
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
GR | 10.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
SK | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/36] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
CZ | 09.12.2009 | ||
EE | 09.12.2009 | ||
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
IE | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
RO | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
BG | 09.03.2010 | ||
PT | 09.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/30] | AT | 09.12.2009 | |
FI | 09.12.2009 | ||
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
PL | 09.12.2009 | ||
SE | 09.12.2009 | ||
SI | 09.12.2009 | ||
Former [2010/22] | FI | 09.12.2009 | |
SE | 09.12.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]JPH08100170 ; | [A]US5097667 (GRAMKOW ASGER [DK]) [A] 5-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0536940 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 1-4 * page 2, line 54 - page 3, line 53 * * claims 1,6 *; | [A]GB2269004 (ICI PLC [GB]) [A] 5-7* the whole document *; | [A]WO9411459 (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,6 *; | [X]JPH08100170 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * page 4 *; | [A]EP0979855 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * claim 1 *; | [A]WO0029796 (ICI PLC [GB], et al) [A] 5-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1072850 (BKT BONNET KAELTETECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-4 * claims 1,5 *; | [A]US2003070722 (THOMAS RAYMOND H P [US], et al) [A] 5-7 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960830), vol. 1996, no. 08, & JP08100170 A 19960416 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-4 * abstract * |