EP1799289 - Disposable monodose inhaler for powdered medicaments [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/26] | DISPOSABLE MONODOSE INHALER FOR POWDERED MEDICAMENTS | ||
[2011/47] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cossi, Giampiero Case Sparse 6 Montemelino 06063 Magione (PG) / IT | [2007/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COSSI, Giampiero Viale dei Colli Portuensi 242 I-00151 Roma RM / IT | 02 /
LA BARBERA, Mario Via Mondello 40 I-90017 Santa Flavia PA / IT | 03 /
CECCHINI, Marco Via R. Gigliarelli, 110 I-06124 Perugia / IT | [2007/26] | Representative(s) | Pizzoli, Antonio Mario, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Pizzoli, Antonio, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2007/26] | Pizzoli, Antonio, et al Società Italiana Brevetti S.p.A, Via Carducci 8 20123 Milano MI / IT | Application number, filing date | 04787593.5 | 16.09.2004 | [2007/26] | WO2004IT00501 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006030459 | Date: | 23.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1799289 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1799289 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61M15/00 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
A61M15/0028 (EP,US);
A61M15/0021 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/26] | Extension states | HR | 04.04.2007 | Title | German: | Einweg-Monodosis-Inhalator für pulverförmige Medikamente | [2011/47] | English: | Disposable monodose inhaler for powdered medicaments | [2011/47] | French: | Inhalateur monodose jetable pour medicaments en poudre | [2011/47] |
Former [2007/26] | EINWEG-MONODOSIS-INHALATOR FÜR PULVERFÖRMIGE MEDIKAMENTE | ||
Former [2007/26] | DISPOSABLE MONODOSE INHALER FOR POWDERED MEDICAMENTS | ||
Former [2007/26] | INHALATEUR MONODOSE JETABLE POUR MEDICAMENTS EN POUDRE | Entry into regional phase | 04.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.04.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/26] | 22.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 05.02.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.05.2012 | EE | 02.05.2012 | FI | 02.05.2012 | SI | 02.05.2012 | BG | 02.08.2012 | LU | 16.09.2012 | MC | 30.09.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2013/34] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
BG | 02.08.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
MC | 30.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
EE | 02.05.2012 | ||
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
SI | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 02.05.2012 | |
FI | 02.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 02.05.2012 | Cited in | International search | [XIY]US5301666 (LERK COENRAAD [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 54 - column 6, line 59; figures 1,2 * [I] 3 [Y] 5-8; | [X]US5435297 (KLEIN CHRISTOPH [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3, line 30 - line 61; figure 1 *; | [YD]US5669378 (PERA IVO [US], et al) [YD] 5-8 * column 7, line 7 - line 51; figures 1,2 ** column 10, line 8 - line 37 * | by applicant | US5301666 | US5669378 | WO03011708 |