EP1667085 - DEVICE FOR DETECTING ROAD TRAVELING LANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.09.2010 [2010/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | For all designated states AISIN SEIKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1 Asahi-machi, 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAKINAMI, Toshiaki, c/o AISIN SEIKI K.K. 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 4488650 / JP | 02 /
HIRAMAKI, Takashi, c/o AISIN SEIKI K.K. 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 4488650 / JP | 03 /
AKITA, Tokihiko, c/o AISIN SEIKI K.K. 1, Asahi-machi 2-chome Kariya-shi, Aichi 4488650 / JP | [2006/23] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/23] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04787985.3 | 22.09.2004 | [2006/23] | WO2004JP13802 | Priority number, date | JP20030331356 | 24.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003331356 | [2006/23] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005029440 | Date: | 31.03.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1667085 | Date: | 07.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.03.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.03.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
G08G1/167 (EP,US);
G08G1/16 (KR);
G06T7/12 (EP,US);
G06T7/73 (EP,US);
G06V10/255 (EP,US);
G06V10/457 (EP,US);
G06V20/588 (EP,US);
G08G1/04 (KR);
G06T2207/10016 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30256 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2006/23] | G08G1/16 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/01] |
Former [2006/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG DER STRASSENREISE | [2006/23] | English: | DEVICE FOR DETECTING ROAD TRAVELING LANE | [2006/23] | French: | DISPOSITIF SERVANT A DETECTER UNE VOIE DE CIRCULATION ROUTIERE | [2006/23] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2006 | Translation filed | 08.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 08.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/23] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/38] | 10.05.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5555312 (SHIMA NOBUKAZU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20 * column 9, line 25 - column 14, line 31 *; | [A]US5904725 (IISAKA ATSUSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * column 5, line 28 - column 13, line 9 *; | [A]US2003016287 (NAKAYAMA HIROMITSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-20* paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0072] *; | [DA]JP2003187252 (AISIN SEIKI, et al) [DA] 1-11 * figures 5-7 * | International search | [A]JPH08249597 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [A]JPH1185999 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [A]JP2003030626 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2003228711 (HITACHI LTD) |