EP1674526 - POLYACETAL RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 18-1, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8280 / JP | [2007/12] |
Former [2006/26] | For all designated states Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 18-1, Konan 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARASHINA, Hatsuhiko, c/o Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 973, Miyajima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 4168533 / JP | [2012/49] |
Former [2006/26] | 01 /
HARASHINA, Hatsuhiko, c/o Polyplastics Co., Ltd. 973, Miyajima Fuji-shi, Shizuoka 4168533 / JP | Representative(s) | Broughton, Jon Philip, et al Barker Brettell LLP First Floor, Atrium Court 15-17 Jockey's Fields London WC1R 4BW / GB | [2013/37] |
Former [2012/23] | Peel, James Peter, et al Barker Brettell LLP Barnes 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | ||
Former [2011/34] | Peel, James Peter, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/26] | Peel, James Peter, et al Barker Brettell, 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 04788008.3 | 22.09.2004 | [2006/26] | WO2004JP13825 | Priority number, date | JP20030343684 | 01.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003343684 | [2006/26] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005033200 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1674526 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1674526 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1674526 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | [2013/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C08L59/00, C08K5/25, C08L71/02, C08L83/04 | [2006/26] | CPC: |
C08L59/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/25 (EP,KR,US);
B29B11/10 (KR);
B29B9/06 (KR);
C08J5/00 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/25, C08L59/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/26] | Title | German: | POLYACETALHARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2006/26] | English: | POLYACETAL RESIN COMPOSITION | [2006/26] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RESINE POLYACETAL | [2006/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2006 | Translation filed | 24.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 26.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.07.2007 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.09.2004 | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | IT | 05.12.2012 | MC | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | PL | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
MC | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | SE | 05.12.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1020201 (BAYER AG) [X] 1-19 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 21 * * page 3, line 59 - page 4, line 6; claims 1,2 *; | [A]DE1235577 (SCHERING AG) [A] 1-19 * column 4, lines 6-11 *; | [A]US3574786 (ISHIDA SHINICHI, et al) [A] 1-19 * column 2, line 47 - column 3, line 4 *; | [X]EP0333660 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-19 * page 2, line 40 - page 4, line 52 * * page 7, lines 19-33; claim - *; | [X]JPH04345648 (DU PONT JAPAN) [X] 1-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0015]; example - *; | [X]WO0105888 (POLYPLASTICS CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0224797 (MILLIKEN & CO [US]) [A] 1-19 * examples 2,3; tables I,IV,V *; | [XP]US6753363 (HARASHINA HATSUHIKO [JP]) [XP] 1-19 * column 2, line 22 - column 4, line 29 * * column 6, line 66 - column 12, line 18 * * column 26, lines 23-59 * * column 29, line 63 - column 30, line 32 * * column 31, lines 6-15 ** column 31, line 58 - column 38, line 6; example 38; claim - * | International search | [X]JPH10298401 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [X]JPH1036630 (POLYPLASTICS CO); | [X]JPH069854 (POLYPLASTICS CO); | [Y]JPH1036524 (POLYPLASTICS CO); | [Y]JP2001178805 (NICHIAS CORP) | by applicant | US3152101 | JPH04345648 | US6753363 | JPH1036524 |