EP1796291 - TRANSMISSION POWER CONTROL UNIT AND TRANSMISSION POWER CONTROL METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.08.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.09.2013 [2013/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Fujitsu Ltd. 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | ||
For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAUCHI, Natsuhiko FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 02 /
TOMIYOSHI, Norio, FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 03 /
YAMANO, Osamu, FUJITSU LIMITED 1-1, Kamikodanaka 4-chome, Nakahara-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 211-8588 / JP | 04 /
OKUMURA, Yukihiko, NTT DoCoMo I.P. Dept, SANNO PARK TOWER, 2-11-1, Nagatacho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2007/24] | Representative(s) | Lewin, David Nicholas, et al Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/21] | Lewin, David Nicholas, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2008/41] | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | ||
Former [2007/24] | Hitching, Peter Matthew Haseltine Lake Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 04788291.5 | 29.09.2004 | [2007/24] | WO2004JP14224 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006035498 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1796291 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/26 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
H04W52/241 (EP,US);
H04W52/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/01] |
Former [2007/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SENDELEISTUNGSREGELEINHEIT UND SENDELEISTUNGSREGELVERFAHREN | [2007/24] | English: | TRANSMISSION POWER CONTROL UNIT AND TRANSMISSION POWER CONTROL METHOD | [2007/24] | French: | UNITE DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE D"EMISSION ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE DE PUISSANCE D"EMISSION | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2007 | Translation filed | 25.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 25.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 03.04.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/39] | 06.05.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0101603 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [Y]EP1107482 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) |