EP1670008 - ORGANIC ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fuji Jukogyo Kabushiki Kaisha 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | [2012/37] |
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states FUJI JUKOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 160-8316 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDO, Nobuo c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 02 /
KOJIMA, Kenji c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 03 /
TASAKI, Shinichi c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 04 /
TAGUCHI, Hiromoto c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 05 /
FUJII, Tsutomu, c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 06 /
HATO, Yukinori c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | 07 /
MARUMO, Chisato, c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | [2012/37] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
ANDO, Nobuo 5-2-11, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | ||
02 /
KOJIMA, Kenji 5-2-8, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | |||
03 /
TASAKI, Shinichi 6-9-406, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | |||
04 /
TAGUCHI, Hiromoto 6-6-207, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | |||
05 /
FUJII, Tsutomu, c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
HATO, Yukinori 5-1-6, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | |||
07 /
MARUMO, Chisato, c/o Fuji Jukogyo K.K. 7-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku, Tokyo / JP | |||
Former [2006/24] | 01 /
ANDO, Nobuo 5-2-11, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | ||
02 /
KOJIMA, Kenji 5-2-8, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | |||
03 /
TASAKI, Shinichi 6-9-406, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | |||
04 /
TAGUCHI, Hiromoto 6-6-207, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | |||
05 /
FUJII, Tsutomu 6-6-208, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | |||
06 /
HATO, Yukinori 5-1-6, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | |||
07 /
MARUMO, Chisato 6-8-405, Kanebo-cho Hofu-shi, Yamaguchi 747-0823 / JP | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/24] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04788437.4 | 27.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004JP14550 | Priority number, date | JP20030341129 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: JP 2003341129 | [2006/24] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005031773 | Date: | 07.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1670008 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1670008 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 07.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01G9/058, H01M10/36 | [2012/19] | CPC: |
H01G11/06 (EP,US);
H01G9/028 (KR);
H01G11/50 (EP,US);
H01G11/70 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4292 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/24] | H01G9/058, H01M10/40 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/01] |
Former [2006/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ORGANISCHER ELEKTROLYTKONDENSATOR | [2006/24] | English: | ORGANIC ELECTROLYTIC CAPACITOR | [2006/24] | French: | CONDENSATEUR ELECTROLYTIQUE ORGANIQUE | [2006/24] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2006 | Translation filed | 28.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2006 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 28.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 05.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 30.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.10.2011 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 12.09.2012 | GB | 12.12.2012 | [2013/51] |
Former [2013/22] | NL | 12.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO03003395 (KANEBO LTD [JP], et al)[A] 1-4; | [PA]EP1400996 (KANEBO LTD [JP]) [PA] 1-4 * claim - * | International search | [X]JP2000306609 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [X]JPH1154383 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [X]JPS6414882 (MITSUBISHI GAS CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPS60182670 (TORAY INDUSTRIES, et al); | [X]JPH0955342 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [X]JPH09232190 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [X]JPH11297578 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [X]JPH08107048 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD); | [Y]WO9833227 (KANEBO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JPH0144212B | JPH0324024B |