EP1687138 - DECORATIVE PROTECTIVE FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.08.2008 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 09.12.2009 [2009/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O. Box 33427 St. Paul, MN 55133-3427 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul MN 55133-3427 / US | ||
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company P.O.Box 33427 St. Paul Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAMIYAMA, Kehju 5500 Oaza Osanagi Higashine, Yamagata 993-3737 / JP | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Belgium B.V.B.A./S.P.R.L. Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/50] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Europe S.A./N.V. OIPC Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2006/32] | Voortmans, Gilbert J.L., et al 3M Europe S.A., Hermeslaan 7 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 04789103.1 | 27.09.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004US31687 | Priority number, date | US20030514987P | 28.10.2003 Original published format: US 514987 P | [2006/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005044558 | Date: | 19.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687138 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/08, B32B7/12, C09J7/02, B44C1/17 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
B32B27/36 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/12 (US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/40 (EP,US);
B32B3/30 (EP,US);
B32B7/12 (EP,US);
B44C1/105 (EP,US);
C09J7/29 (EP,US);
B32B2307/54 (US);
B32B2307/702 (US);
B32B2367/00 (US);
B32B2375/00 (US);
B32B2451/00 (US);
C09J2301/162 (EP,US);
C09J2433/00 (EP,US);
C09J2467/006 (EP,US);
C09J2475/006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZIERSCHUTZFOLIE | [2006/32] | English: | DECORATIVE PROTECTIVE FILM | [2006/32] | French: | FILM PROTECTEUR DECORATIF | [2006/32] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 01.04.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/39] | 07.05.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2008/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]JP2000094596 ; | [A]US6387472 (RECK ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-17* column 4, line 50 - column 5, line 13; figure 1 *; | [DA]WO02081231 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US], et al) [DA] 1-17 * page 2, line 13 - line 16; figure 1; claim 1 * * page 4, line 13 - line 20 * * page 8, line 17 * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000929), vol. 2000, no. 07, & JP2000094596 A 20000404 (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD) [DA] 1-17 * abstract * |