EP1794226 - NEW FUNCTIONAL ADDITIVE IN POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.02.2014 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Minerals Corporation 1732 North First Street Suite 450 San Jose California 95112 / US | [2013/38] |
Former [2007/24] | For all designated states Advanced Minerals Corporation 130 Castilian Drive Santa Barbara California 93117 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DANVERS, Nigel, Julian, Keith 40, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | 02 /
WANG, Bo 160 Hercules Avenue Lompoc, CA 93436 / US | 03 /
INCE, Dursun 229 King Daniel Lane Goleta, CA 93117 / US | 04 /
CASTERAN, Thierry 18, avenue Dubonnet F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | 05 /
MASTERS, Andrew, L. 478 Paseo del Descanso Santa Barbara, CA 93105-2928 / US | 06 /
ROTHON, Roger Norman 3 Orchard Croft Guilden Sutton Chester CH3 7SL / GB | [2013/17] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
DANVERS, Nigel, Julian, Keith 40, rue de Ponthieu F-75008 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
WANG, Bo 160 Hercules Avenue Lompoc, CA 93436 / US | |||
03 /
INCE, Dursun 229 King Daniel Lane Goleta, CA 93117 / US | |||
04 /
CASTERAN, Thierry 18, avenue Dubonnet F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | |||
05 /
MASTERS, Andrew, L. 478 Paseo del Descanso Santa Barbara, CA 93105-2928 / US | |||
06 /
ROTHON, Roger Norman 3 Orchard Croft, Guilden Sutton Chester CH3 7SL / GB | Representative(s) | Nash, David Allan Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2013/17] |
Former [2007/24] | Nash, David Allan HASELTINE LAKE, Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 04789247.6 | 28.09.2004 | [2007/24] | WO2004US31968 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006036151 | Date: | 06.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1794226 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1794226 | Date: | 24.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C08K3/34, C08K9/00 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
C08K3/01 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2982 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2995 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Title | German: | NEUES FUNKTIONELLES ADDITIV IN POLYMEREN | [2007/24] | English: | NEW FUNCTIONAL ADDITIVE IN POLYMERS | [2007/24] | French: | NOUVEL ADDITIF FONCTIONNEL DE POLYMERES | [2007/24] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 08.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 20.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2008 | Opposition(s) | 27.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/14] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 17.02.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 17.02.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.03.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.09.2004 | AT | 24.04.2013 | CY | 24.04.2013 | CZ | 24.04.2013 | DK | 24.04.2013 | EE | 24.04.2013 | FI | 24.04.2013 | MC | 24.04.2013 | NL | 24.04.2013 | PL | 24.04.2013 | RO | 24.04.2013 | SE | 24.04.2013 | SI | 24.04.2013 | SK | 24.04.2013 | TR | 24.04.2013 | BG | 24.07.2013 | GR | 25.07.2013 | ES | 04.08.2013 | PT | 26.08.2013 | IE | 28.09.2013 | LU | 28.09.2013 | CH | 30.09.2013 | LI | 30.09.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
TR | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
CH | 30.09.2013 | ||
LI | 30.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
IE | 28.09.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
MC | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
NL | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
RO | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
CZ | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SK | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
DK | 24.04.2013 | ||
EE | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
CY | 24.04.2013 | ||
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
PL | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
BG | 24.07.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
FI | 24.04.2013 | ||
SE | 24.04.2013 | ||
SI | 24.04.2013 | ||
GR | 25.07.2013 | ||
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 24.04.2013 | |
ES | 04.08.2013 | ||
PT | 26.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 26.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JPH0819702 ; | [XY]US4325844 (OLMSTED JR BRUCE C) [X] 1-19,22-31 * claim -; tables II,VII * [Y] 20,21; | [Y]FR2586588 (WTOZ BRAU MALZINDUSTRIE [DD]) [Y] 20 * page 7, line 31 - page 8, line 9; claim 1 *; | [XY]EP0758560 (ADVANCED MINERALS CORP [US]) [X] 1-19,22-31 * page 10, lines 20-36; example 2; claim - * [Y] 20,21; | [XY]US6074474 (BROOME THAD T [US], et al) [X] 1-19,22-31 * column 4, lines 1-15; example 2; claim - * [Y] 20,21; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1996, no. 13, Database accession no. 1996-123347, XP002468868 & JPH0819702 A 19960123 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP) [X] 1-31 * abstract * | [Y] - BHIRUD, Y. B. ET AL, "Role of classification in powder coating paint production", CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS SERVICE, COLUMBUS, OHIO, US, Database accession no. 130:339386, URL: STN, XP002468935 [Y] 21 * abstract * | International search | [X]US4325844 (OLMSTED JR BRUCE C); | [X]US5153063 (OKITA TSUTOMU [JP], et al); | [X]JPH0819702 (MITSUBISHI MATERIALS CORP); | [Y]US5656568 (SHIUH JEROME C [US], et al); | [A]US6140040 (PALM SCOTT K [US], et al) |