EP1668954 - USING AN EXTENDED BORDER GATEWAY PROTOCOL FOR ROUTING ACROSS OPTICAL-BURST-SWITCHED NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/27] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | ||
Former [2006/24] | For all designated states INTEL CORPORATION 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OVADIA, Shlomo 1576 Willow Oaks Drive San Jose, CA 95125 / US | 02 /
MACIOCCO, Christian 16322 SW Stahl Drive Tigard, OR 97223 / US | [2006/24] | Representative(s) | Want, Clifford James, et al HGF Limited 140 London Wall London EC2Y 5DN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/24] | Want, Clifford James, et al Harrison Goddard Foote 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 04789371.4 | 29.09.2004 | [2006/24] | WO2004US32215 | Priority number, date | US20030674650 | 30.09.2003 Original published format: US 674650 | [2006/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005034569 | Date: | 14.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/15] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1668954 | Date: | 14.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1668954 | Date: | 07.07.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q11/00 | [2006/24] | CPC: |
H04Q11/0066 (EP,US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US);
H04L45/62 (EP,US);
H04Q11/0071 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0073 (EP,US);
H04Q2011/0088 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/24] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG EINES ERWEITERTEN GRENZ-GATEWAY-PROTOKOLLS ZUM ROUTEN ÜBER LICHTBURSTVERMITTELTE NETZWERKE HINWEG | [2006/24] | English: | USING AN EXTENDED BORDER GATEWAY PROTOCOL FOR ROUTING ACROSS OPTICAL-BURST-SWITCHED NETWORKS | [2006/24] | French: | ROUTAGE DANS UN RESEAU A COMMUTATION OPTIQUE PAR RAFALES EN UTILISANT UN PROTOCOLE DE PASSERELLE A BORD ETENDU | [2010/07] |
Former [2006/24] | ROUTAGE DE RESEAU A COMMUTATION OPTIQUE OS A RESEAU OS UTILISANT UN PROTOCOLE DE PASSERELLE A BORD ETENDU | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2006 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/24] | 09.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.04.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.07.2010 | BE | 07.07.2010 | CY | 07.07.2010 | CZ | 07.07.2010 | DK | 07.07.2010 | EE | 07.07.2010 | FI | 07.07.2010 | IT | 07.07.2010 | NL | 07.07.2010 | PL | 07.07.2010 | PT | 07.07.2010 | RO | 07.07.2010 | SE | 07.07.2010 | SI | 07.07.2010 | SK | 07.07.2010 | TR | 07.07.2010 | IE | 29.09.2010 | LU | 29.09.2010 | CH | 30.09.2010 | FR | 30.09.2010 | LI | 30.09.2010 | MC | 30.09.2010 | BG | 07.10.2010 | GR | 08.10.2010 | ES | 18.10.2010 | HU | 08.01.2011 | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
TR | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LU | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LU | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
HU | 08.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 30.09.2010 | ||
FR | 30.09.2010 | ||
LI | 30.09.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
IT | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
RO | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
ES | 18.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
CZ | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
EE | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
SK | 07.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
DK | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
MC | 30.09.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
BE | 07.07.2010 | ||
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SE | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
GR | 08.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/13] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
CY | 07.07.2010 | ||
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
FI | 07.07.2010 | ||
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
PL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
BG | 07.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 07.07.2010 | |
NL | 07.07.2010 | ||
SI | 07.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/52] | SI | 07.07.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002109878 (QIAO CHUNMING [US]) [A] 1-45* paragraph [0012] *; | [YA] - REKHTER Y ET AL, "A Border Gateway Protocol 4 (BGP-4)", IETF REQUEST FOR COMMENTS 1771, (199503), XP002226832 [Y] 1,16,21,30,39 * page 2, paragraph 6 * * page 3, paragraph 5 * * page 4, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 5, paragraph 3.1 * [A] 2-15,17-20,22-29,31-38,40-45 | [YA] - YOO S J B, "OPTICAL-LABEL SWITCHING, MPLS, MPLAMBDAS, AND GMPLS", OPTICAL NETWORKS MAGAZINE, SPIE, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (200305), vol. 4, no. 3, ISSN 1388-6916, pages 17 - 31, XP001162964 [Y] 1,16,21,30,39 * figures 3,7,9,10 * * page 19, paragraph 2.1 - page 21, line 21 * [A] 2-15,17-20,22-29,31-38,40-45 | [A] - COMELLAS J ET AL, "INTEGRATED IP/WDM ROUTING IN GMPLS-BASED OPTICAL NETWORKS", IEEE NETWORK, IEEE INC. NEW YORK, US, (200303), vol. 17, no. 2, ISSN 0890-8044, pages 22 - 27, XP001149576 [A] 1-45 * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MNET.2003.1188283 | [A] - GHANI N ET AL, "ON IP-OVER-WDM INTEGRATION", IEEE COMMUNICATIONS MAGAZINE, IEEE SERVICE CENTER. PISCATAWAY, N.J, US, (200003), vol. 38, no. 3, ISSN 0163-6804, pages 72 - 84, XP000948526 [A] 1-45 * figures 2,3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/35.825644 |