EP1694162 - DISPLACEABLE PIECE OF FURNITURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUBER, Edgar Eicheleweg 9 A-6971 Hard / AT | [2006/35] | Representative(s) | Torggler, Paul Norbert Torggler & Hofinger Patentanwälte Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2006/35] | Torggler, Paul Norbert Patentanwälte Torggler & Hofinger Wilhelm-Greil-Strasse 16 Postfach 556 6020 Innsbruck / AT | Application number, filing date | 04789565.1 | 29.10.2004 | [2006/35] | WO2004AT00376 | Priority number, date | AT20030002036 | 17.12.2003 Original published format: AT 20362003 | [2006/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005058092 | Date: | 30.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1694162 | Date: | 30.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1694162 | Date: | 03.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/04, E05F15/20 | [2006/35] | CPC: |
E05F15/70 (EP,US);
A47B88/457 (EP,US);
E05F15/611 (EP,US);
E05F15/75 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/3015 (EP,US);
E05Y2400/44 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/35] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGBARES MÖBELTEIL | [2006/35] | English: | DISPLACEABLE PIECE OF FURNITURE | [2006/35] | French: | ELEMENT MOBILIER MOBILE | [2006/35] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/35] | 10.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.08.2011 | CZ | 03.08.2011 | DK | 03.08.2011 | EE | 03.08.2011 | FI | 03.08.2011 | HU | 03.08.2011 | IE | 03.08.2011 | NL | 03.08.2011 | PL | 03.08.2011 | PT | 03.08.2011 | RO | 03.08.2011 | SE | 03.08.2011 | SI | 03.08.2011 | SK | 03.08.2011 | LU | 29.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | CH | 31.10.2011 | LI | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | FR | 02.11.2011 | BG | 03.11.2011 | GB | 03.11.2011 | GR | 04.11.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
HU | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
LU | 29.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GB | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
LU | 29.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
BG | 03.11.2011 | ||
GB | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
LU | 29.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
GB | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/46] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
GB | 03.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
FR | 02.11.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/33] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
DK | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
CH | 31.10.2011 | ||
LI | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
EE | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
RO | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
SK | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
CZ | 03.08.2011 | ||
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
IE | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 03.08.2011 | |
FI | 03.08.2011 | ||
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
PL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
SI | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
SE | 03.08.2011 | ||
GR | 04.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 03.08.2011 | |
NL | 03.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | NL | 03.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [DX]EP1323363 (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [DX] 1-13 * column 4, line 32 - line 37 * * column 4, line 43 - line 47 * * column 4, line 49 - line 54 ** column 6, line 36 - line 42; figure 6 * | by applicant | EP1323363 |