EP1679040 - EASILY RETRIEVED BIOLOGICAL SPECIMEN POUCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 19.12.2012 [2012/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zhou, Xing Room 601, Building 12 No. 19, Xianlie Southern Road Guangzhou Guangdong 510060 / CN | For all designated states Li, Yanfang Room 601, Building 12, No. 19, Xianlie Southern Road Guangzhou Guangdong 510060 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Zhou, Xing Room 601, Building 12, No. 19, Xianlie Southern Road Guangzhou Guangdong 510060 / CN | ||
For all designated states Li, Yanfang Room 601, Building 12, No. 19, Xianlie Southern Road Guangzhou Guangdong 510060 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHOU, Xing Room 601, Bldg. 12, No.19, Xianlie Southern Road Guangzhou, Guangdong 510060 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yanfang Room 601, Bldg. 12, No.19, Xianlie Southern Road Guangzhou, Guangdong 510060 / CN | 03 /
GUO, Aijun Room 601, Bldg 12, No.19, Xianlie Southern Road Guangzhou, Guangdong 510060 / CN | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Stenborg, Anders Vilhelm, et al Aros Patent AB P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Stenborg, Anders Vilhelm, et al Aros Patent AB, P.O. Box 1544 751 45 Uppsala / SE | Application number, filing date | 04789836.6 | 15.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004CN01174 | Priority number, date | CN20031111814 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: CN200310111814 | [2006/28] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005037107 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1679040 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 28.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
A61B10/00 (EP,US);
A61B17/221 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00287 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LEICHT ZURÜCKHOLBARER BIOLOGISCHER PROBENBEUTEL | [2006/28] | English: | EASILY RETRIEVED BIOLOGICAL SPECIMEN POUCH | [2006/28] | French: | POCHE A ECHANTILLON BIOLOGIQUE DE RECUPERATION FACILE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 27.03.2006 | Translation filed | 17.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 30.06.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 03.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/51] | 03.08.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 13.08.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/51] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO9616601 (GORE & ASS [US]) [X] 1,2,4,7,10-12 * page 7, line 14 - page 8, line 10 * * page 9, lines 10-20 * * figures 1,3,6-9,12 * [I] 3,5,6,8,9,13,14; | [XI]US5735289 (PFEFFER HERBERT G [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,11 * column 4, lines 6-14 * * column 7, lines 33-49 * * figure 8 * [I] 3,5,8-10,12-14; | [XI]US6270505 (YOSHIDA OSAMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,10,11 * column 10, line 37 - column 11, line 12; figures 1,2,3a,3b *[I] 2-6,8,9,12-14; | [XI]US2003009177 (MIDDLEMAN LEE M [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0206] - [0208] - [0213] - [0218] - [0239]; figures 3_2, 3_3, 3_4, 3_5, 3_9b * [I] 13,14 | International search | [A]CN1393206 (ETHICON ENDO SURGERY INC [US]); | [A]CN2178119Y (ZHANG ZHIXING [CN]); | [A]CN2497733Y (LIU FENGRU [CN]); | [A]CN2489726Y (JIN HAIMING [CN]); | [AP]CN1524500 (ZHOU XING [CN]); | [A]US5980544 (VAITEKUNAS JEFFREY J [US]); | [A]US5647372 (TOVEY H JONATHAN [US], et al); | [A]US5480404 (KAMMERER GENE W [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003009177 | WO9616601 | US5735289 | US6270505 |