EP1615663 - AGENT FOR TREATING LEISHMANIA INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 25.08.2010 [2010/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mologen AG Fabeckstrasse 30 14195 Berlin / DE | [2006/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WITTIG, Burghardt Salzachstrasse 33 14129 Berlin / DE | 02 /
FUERTES-LOPEZ, Laura C/Alonso Cano 72, 3o dcha E-28003 Madrid / ES | 03 /
TIMON-JIMENEZ, Marcos C/ Santa Clara 34, 2K E-28200 San Lorenzo de El Escorial / ES | [2006/03] | Representative(s) | Boeckh, Tobias, et al Hertin und Partner Rechts- und Patentanwälte PartG mbB Kurfürstendamm 54/55 10707 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/03] | Boeckh, Tobias, et al Hertin Anwaltssozietät Postfach 15 14 60 D-10676 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 04790046.9 | 22.10.2004 | [2006/03] | WO2004DE02383 | Priority number, date | EP20030090368 | 24.10.2003 Original published format: EP 03090368 | [2006/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005039633 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1615663 | Date: | 18.01.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1615663 | Date: | 26.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/008 | [2006/03] | CPC: |
C07K14/44 (EP,US);
A61K31/7088 (EP,US);
A61K39/008 (EP,US);
A61P33/02 (EP);
C12N15/85 (EP,US);
A61K2039/53 (EP,US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | 14.11.2005 | LV | 14.11.2005 | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MITTEL ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON INFEKTIONEN MIT LEISHMANIEN | [2006/03] | English: | AGENT FOR TREATING LEISHMANIA INFECTIONS | [2006/03] | French: | PRODUIT DE TRAITEMENT DES INFECTIONS PAR LEISHMANIA | [2006/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/03] | 16.02.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 06.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 26.12.2007 | EE | 26.12.2007 | FI | 26.12.2007 | PL | 26.12.2007 | RO | 26.12.2007 | SI | 26.12.2007 | SK | 26.12.2007 | BG | 26.03.2008 | HU | 27.06.2008 | [2010/34] |
Former [2009/24] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
PL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
BG | 26.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
EE | 26.12.2007 | ||
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
PL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/39] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
PL | 26.12.2007 | ||
RO | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
SK | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CZ | 26.12.2007 | |
FI | 26.12.2007 | ||
PL | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | FI | 26.12.2007 | |
PL | 26.12.2007 | ||
SI | 26.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | FI | 26.12.2007 | |
PL | 26.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO02098359 (CORIXA CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,3,6,8,13,14,17-20,22 * examples 19-23; claim - * [Y] 1-28; | [XY]WO03031469 (MOLOGEN FORSCHUNGS ENTWICKLUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,6-17,19,21-26 * example -; claim - * [Y] 1-28; | [XY] - LOPEZ-FUERTES L ET AL, "DNA vaccination with linear minimalistic (MIDGE) vectors confers protection against Leishmania major infection in mice", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20021213), vol. 21, no. 3-4, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 247 - 257, XP004394510 [X] 1,6-10,12-17,19,21-24,26 * Zusammenfassung; Ergebnisse; Diskussion; * [Y] 1-28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(02)00450-4 | [XY] - SKEIKY Y A W ET AL, "Protective efficacy of a tandemly linked, multi-subunit recombinant leishmanial vaccine (Leish-111f) formulated in MPL adjuvant", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20020910), vol. 20, no. 27-28, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3292 - 3303, XP004378524 [X] 1,3,6,8,13,14,17-20,22 * Zusammenfassung; Diskussion; * [Y] 1-28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(02)00302-X | [XY] - MENDEZ S ET AL, "Optimization of DNA vaccination against cutaneous leishmaniasis", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20021101), vol. 20, no. 31-32, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 3702 - 3708, XP004388612 [X] 1,2,6,8,13,14,17,19,22 * Zusammenfassung; Diskussion; * [Y] 1-28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(02)00376-6 | [XY] - RAMREZ J R ET AL, "Attenuated Toxoplasma gondii ts-4 mutants engineered to express the Leishmania antigen KMP-11 elicit a specific immune response in BALB/c mice", VACCINE, BUTTERWORTH SCIENTIFIC. GUILDFORD, GB, (20011112), vol. 20, no. 3-4, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 455 - 461, XP004310152 [X] 1,8,13,14,17,19,22 * abstract * [Y] 1-28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0264-410X(01)00341-3 | [XY] - COTE-SIERRA JAVIER ET AL, "Bacterial lipoprotein-based vaccines induce tumor necrosis factor-dependent type 1 protective immunity against Leishmania major", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (200201), vol. 70, no. 1, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 240 - 248, XP002317814 [X] 1,8,13,14,17,19,22 * abstract * [Y] 1-28 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.70.1.240-248.2002 |