EP1682723 - SECURITY ELEMENT WITH A COLOR-SHIFT EFFECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.10.2014 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, TR | published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEIM, Manfred Schönstrasse 59 81543 München / DE | 02 /
HOFFMÜLLER, Winfried Marktstrasse 75 83646 Bad Tölz / DE | [2006/30] | Application number, filing date | 04790373.7 | 13.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004EP11506 | Priority number, date | DE2003149000 | 17.10.2003 Original published format: DE 10349000 | [2006/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005038136 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682723 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1682723 | Date: | 11.12.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D21H21/42 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B41M3/14 (EP);
B42D25/41 (US);
B42D25/21 (US);
B42D25/328 (EP,US);
B42D25/351 (US);
B42D25/355 (EP);
C09C1/0015 (EP);
D21H21/42 (EP);
B42D2035/24 (EP);
C09C2200/1062 (EP);
C09C2200/1066 (EP);
C09C2210/30 (EP);
C09C2210/40 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Title | German: | SICHERHEITSELEMENT MIT FARBKIPPEFFEKT | [2006/30] | English: | SECURITY ELEMENT WITH A COLOR-SHIFT EFFECT | [2006/30] | French: | ELEMENT DE SECURITE A EFFET DE DERIVE CHROMATIQUE | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 17.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 12.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 12.09.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.10.2004 | BG | 11.12.2013 | CY | 11.12.2013 | CZ | 11.12.2013 | DK | 11.12.2013 | EE | 11.12.2013 | ES | 11.12.2013 | FI | 11.12.2013 | MC | 11.12.2013 | NL | 11.12.2013 | PL | 11.12.2013 | RO | 11.12.2013 | SE | 11.12.2013 | SI | 11.12.2013 | SK | 11.12.2013 | TR | 11.12.2013 | GR | 12.03.2014 | PT | 11.04.2014 | [2016/32] |
Former [2016/28] | BG | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
GR | 12.03.2014 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | BG | 11.12.2013 | |
CY | 11.12.2013 | ||
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
MC | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SI | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
DK | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
CZ | 11.12.2013 | ||
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
ES | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
PL | 11.12.2013 | ||
RO | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
SK | 11.12.2013 | ||
PT | 11.04.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
EE | 11.12.2013 | ||
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/26] | CY | 11.12.2013 | |
FI | 11.12.2013 | ||
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 11.12.2013 | |
NL | 11.12.2013 | ||
SE | 11.12.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]US3711176 (ALFREY T, et al) [A] 1-70 * the whole document *; | [A]US3962397 (NARUI HIROSHI, et al) [A] 47-70 * the whole document *; | [A]US4216018 (BILOFSKY RUTH C [US], et al) [A] 1-70* the whole document *; | [A]US4639069 (YATABE TOSHIAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-70 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0341002 (FLEX PRODUCTS INC [US]) [A] 1-70 * the whole document *; | [X]EP0395410 (FLEX PRODUCTS INC [US]) [X] 1 * figure 1; claims 1-10 *; | [X]US5279657 (PHILLIPS ROGER W [US], et al) [X] 1 * column 15, lines 37-64; figures 3c,3e; claims 1-5 *; | [X]EP0733919 (CATALINA COATINGS INC [US]) [X] 1,2,7,29,31,33,34,47,52,64 * figures 1-4,14; claims 1-27 *; | [A]US5571624 (PHILLIPS ROGER W [US], et al) [A] 1-70 * the whole document *; | [A]US6616803 (ISHERWOOD ROLAND [GB], et al) [A] 1-70 * the whole document * | Examination | US6010751 | by applicant | EP0733919 |