EP1682416 - A CONTAINER FOR PRODUCT WITH LESS PACKAGING MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2007 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.10.2007 [2007/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nestlé Waters Management & Technology 20, rue Rouget de Lisle 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DURAND, Cyrille 57, rue du Luxembourg F-88800 Vittel / FR | 02 /
DENIS, Gérard 1bis, rue Jules Hansen F-51100 Reims / FR | 03 /
CONTAL, Alain Route du Jorat 142, Vers-chez-les Blanc ch-1000 Lausanne 26 / CH | 04 /
ROULIN, Anne Rue St-Nicolas 402 F-88800 Vittel / FR | [2006/30] | Application number, filing date | 04790459.4 | 15.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004EP11606 | Priority number, date | EP20030024855 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: EP 03024855 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005047120 | Date: | 26.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1682416 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D1/02 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B65D1/0223 (EP,US);
B65D1/02 (KR);
B65D1/023 (EP,US);
B65D1/26 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER FÜR EIN PRODUKT MIT WENIGER VERPACKUNGSMATERIAL | [2006/30] | English: | A CONTAINER FOR PRODUCT WITH LESS PACKAGING MATERIAL | [2006/30] | French: | RECIPIENT CONSTITUE D'UNE QUANTITE REDUITE DE MATERIAU | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 31.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 21.09.2007 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3733309 (WYETH N, et al) [A] 1,6,17 * claim 1 *; | [A]US5398826 (TAKAKUSAKI NOBUYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,17* column 7, line 63 - column 8, line 6 *; | [A]FR2830844 (PERRIER VITTEL MAN ET TECHNOLO [FR]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * |