|
27.06.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2018 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2017 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2016 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2014 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.12.2013 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.12.2012 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
101 |
|
27.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
25.07.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
5 |
|
19.07.2011 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.03.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.03.2011 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
8 |
|
16.03.2011 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.07.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.09.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.08.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.05.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2007 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
19.10.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.05.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.10.2006 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.07.2006 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.05.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.05.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.06.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.05.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
15.12.2004 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
9 |