EP1806015 - A METHOD FOR CONFIGURING A RADIO TERMINAL THROUGH A RADIO COMMUNICATION NETWORK, RELATED NETWORK AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telecom Italia S.p.A. Piazza degli Affari 2 20123 Milano / IT | [2007/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURACCHINI, Enrico TELECOM ITALIA S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | 02 /
GORIA, Paolo Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | 03 /
TROGOLO, Alessandro Telecom Italia S.p.A. Via G. Reiss Romoli, 274 I-10148 Torino / IT | [2007/28] | Representative(s) | Battipede, Francesco, et al Telecom Italia S.p.A. Patents Via Guglielmo Reiss Romoli, 274 10148 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/16] | Battipede, Francesco, et al Telecom Italia S.p.A. Piazza L. Einaudi, 8 20124 MIlano / IT | ||
Former [2007/28] | Giannesi, Pier Giovanni Pirelli & C. S.p.A. Viale Sarca, 222 20126 Milan / IT | Application number, filing date | 04790938.7 | 28.10.2004 | [2007/28] | WO2004EP12165 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006045334 | Date: | 04.05.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806015 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1806015 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04W8/24 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
H04W8/245 (EP,US);
H04W8/22 (EP,US);
H04W88/06 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/28] | H04Q7/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM KONFIGURIEREN EINES FUNKENDGERÄTS DURCH EIN FUNKKOMMUNIKATIONSNETZ, DIESBEZÜGLICHES NETZ UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT DAFÜR | [2007/28] | English: | A METHOD FOR CONFIGURING A RADIO TERMINAL THROUGH A RADIO COMMUNICATION NETWORK, RELATED NETWORK AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT THEREFOR | [2007/28] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONFIGURATION UN TERMINAL RADIO VIA UN RESEAU DE COMMUNICATION, RESEAU ASSOCIE, ET PROGRAMME INFORMATIQUE A CET EFFET | [2007/28] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2007 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2007 | Examination requested [2007/28] | 04.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.07.2008 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.09.2010 | BE | 29.09.2010 | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | NL | 29.09.2010 | PL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | IE | 28.10.2010 | LU | 28.10.2010 | CH | 31.10.2010 | LI | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | PT | 31.01.2011 | HU | 30.03.2011 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
LU | 28.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
LU | 28.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
HU | 30.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CY | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 28.10.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
CH | 31.10.2010 | ||
LI | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
BE | 29.09.2010 | ||
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/24] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
NL | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/15] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
Former [2011/11] | AT | 29.09.2010 | |
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
Former [2011/08] | AT | 29.09.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2002085568 (OOMMEN PAUL P [US]) [A] 1-29* paragraphs [0015] - [0026] *; | [Y]US6463055 (LUPIEN FRANCIS [CA], et al) [Y] 1-29 * paragraphs [0036] - [0046] - [0063] - [0073] *; | [Y]US6577614 (COOK CHARLES I [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * paragraphs [0020] - [0034]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US2004098715 (AGHERA PARIXIT [IN], et al) [Y] 1-29 * paragraphs [0022] - [0025]; figures 1,2,7 *; | [Y]US2004176129 (MENON NARAYAN P [US], et al) [Y] 1-29 * paragraphs [0013] , [0015] , [0081] - [0089] - [0092] , [0095] - [0101] - [0184] - [0186]; figures 2-8 * | by applicant | US6577614 | US2004176129 |