EP1687596 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING ADDITIONAL FUEL CONSUMPTION IN A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/32] | METHOD FOR DETERMINING ADDITIONAL FUEL CONSUMPTION IN A MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR DISPLAYING ADDITIONAL FUEL CONSUMPTION | ||
[2011/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.2012 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | For all designated states AUDI AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STERNER, Quirin An der Falkenwiese 12 85128 Wolkertshofen / DE | [2006/32] | Representative(s) | Lehle, Josef Audi AG Patentabteilung I/EX 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/32] | Lehle, Josef Audi AG Patentabteilung I/EX 85045 Igolstadt / DE | Application number, filing date | 04790999.9 | 29.10.2004 | [2006/32] | WO2004EP12233 | Priority number, date | DE2003153689 | 17.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10353689 | [2006/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005050146 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1687596 | Date: | 09.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1687596 | Date: | 27.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G01F9/00 | [2006/32] | CPC: |
G01F9/008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/08] |
Former [2006/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG VON KRAFTSTOFFMEHRVERBRAUCH IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2011/18] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING ADDITIONAL FUEL CONSUMPTION IN A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2011/18] | French: | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER UN SURPLUS DE CONSOMMATION DE CARBURANT DANS UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2011/18] |
Former [2006/32] | VERFAHREN ZUR ERMITTLUNG VON KRAFTSTOFFMEHRVERBRAUCH IN EINEM KRAFTFAHRZEUG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ANZEIGE DES KRAFTSTOFFMEHRVERBRAUCHS | ||
Former [2006/32] | METHOD FOR DETERMINING ADDITIONAL FUEL CONSUMPTION IN A MOTOR VEHICLE AND METHOD FOR DISPLAYING ADDITIONAL FUEL CONSUMPTION | ||
Former [2006/32] | PROCEDE POUR DETERMINER UN SURPLUS DE CONSOMMATION DE CARBURANT DANS UN VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE ET PROCEDE POUR AFFICHER LE SURPLUS DE CONSOMMATION DE CARBURANT | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.06.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.06.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/32] | 06.09.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.09.2006 | Opposition(s) | 02.05.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2000088625 ; | [X]US5336932 (BARSKE HEIKO [DE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 15 - line 19 * * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 2 * * column 4, line 64 - line 65 * * column 5, line 1 - line 4 * * column 5, line 65 - column 6, line 23 *; | [A]EP0855579 (AUDI AG [DE]) [A] 1,8* abstract *; | [XAI] - BRODRICK ET AL, "Effects of Engine Speed and Accessory Load on Idling Emissions from Heavy-Duty Truck Engines", JOURNAL OF THE AIR & WASTE MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION, vol. 52, ISSN 1047-3289, (200209), pages 1026 - 1031, URL: www.awma.org/journal/pdfs/2002/9/Brodrick.pdf, (20050418), XP002325027 [X] 8 * page 1026 - page 1027 * [A] 1 [I] 9 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000922), vol. 2000, no. 06, & JP2000088625 A 20000331 (HANSHIN ELECTRIC CO LTD) [A] 1,8 * column A * |