EP1685577 - CONTROL DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING ELECTROMEDICAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ERBE Elektromedizin GmbH Waldhörnlestrasse 17 72072 Tübingen / DE | [2012/36] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states Erbe Elektromedizin GmbH Waldhörnlestrasse 17 72072 Tübingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KÜHNER, Ralf Unteraicherstr. 41 70567 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
HUNDT, Roland Derendinger Strasse 28 72072 Tübingen / DE | [2006/49] |
Former [2006/31] | 01 /
KÜHNER, Ralf Unteraicherstr. 41 70567 Stuttgart / DE | ||
02 /
HUNDT, Roland Hohenneuffenstrasse 45 72666 Neckartailfingen / DE | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/36] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/31] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR, Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04791022.9 | 29.10.2004 | [2006/31] | WO2004EP12261 | Priority number, date | DE2003151199 | 03.11.2003 Original published format: DE 10351199 | [2006/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005043569 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1685577 | Date: | 02.08.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1685577 | Date: | 05.09.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01H3/14 | [2006/31] | CPC: |
H01H3/14 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00973 (EP,US);
A61C1/0023 (EP,US);
H01H2300/03 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/06] |
Former [2006/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | STEUEREINRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG ELEKTROMEDIZINISCHER GERÄTE | [2006/31] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING ELECTROMEDICAL DEVICES | [2006/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE POUR COMMANDER DES APPAREILS ELECTROMEDICAUX | [2006/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/31] | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 27.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US6017354 (CULP JERRY A [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * column 23, line 47 - column 24, line 3; figure 1 * [Y] 4; | [XY]DE20312016U (STEUTE SCHALTGERAETE GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,5,6 * the whole document * [Y] 4; | [Y]US6051797 (MEINEL FRED [DE]) [Y] 4 * figures 1,no,9 *; | [A]EP1217640 (PIZZATO ELETTRICA SRL [IT]) [A] 1-7 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 14; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0232354 (ALCON INC [CH], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * |