EP1680120 - COMBINATIONS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF NEURONAL DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.03.2014 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.04.2014 [2014/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Probiodrug AG Weinbergweg 22 06120 Halle/Saale / DE | [2006/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHULZ, Ingo Heidehäuser 61 06120 Halle/Saale / DE | 02 /
SCHILLING, Stephan Glockenweg 4 06130 Halle/Saale / DE | 03 /
NIESTROJ, André, Johannes Thälmannplatz 1 06193 Sennewitz / DE | 04 /
DEMUTH, Hans-Ulrich Hegelstrasse 14 06114 Halle/Saale / DE | 05 /
ROSSNER, Steffen Schützenstrasse 7 04849 Bad Düben / DE | [2007/13] |
Former [2006/29] | 01 /
SCHULZ, Ingo Heidehäuser 61 06120 Halle/Saale / DE | ||
02 /
SCHILLING, Stephan Läuferweg 4 06128 Halle/Saale / DE | |||
03 /
NIESTROJ, André, Johannes Thälmannplatz 1 06193 Sennewitz / DE | |||
04 /
DEMUTH, Hans-Ulrich Hegelstrasse 14 06114 Halle/Saale / DE | |||
05 /
ROSSNER, Steffen Schützenstrasse 7 04849 Bad Düben / DE | Representative(s) | Hoffmann, Matthias, et al Maikowski & Ninnemann Patentanwälte Kurfürstendamm 54-55 10707 Berlin / DE | [2012/29] | Application number, filing date | 04791058.3 | 29.10.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004EP12301 | Priority number, date | US20030516717P | 03.11.2003 Original published format: US 516717 P | [2006/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005049027 | Date: | 02.06.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1680120 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/473, A61K31/4164, A61K31/4184, A61P25/00, A61P25/02, A61P25/08, A61P25/14, A61P25/16, A61P25/18, A61P25/20, A61P25/22, A61P25/24, A61P25/28, A61P25/32, A61P9/02 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
A61K31/401 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184 (EP,US);
A61K31/426 (EP,US);
A61K31/428 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/4709 (EP,US);
A61K31/473 (EP,US);
A61K31/498 (EP,US);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/02 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/18 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/30 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/4164, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4184, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/473, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSTELLUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEURONALEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2006/29] | English: | COMBINATIONS USEFUL FOR THE TREATMENT OF NEURONAL DISORDERS | [2006/29] | French: | COMBINAISONS UTILES AU TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES NEURONAUX | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.05.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 16.05.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 25.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/15] | 20.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/15] | Divisional application(s) | EP10177019.6 / EP2338490 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.05.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.05.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5434161 (BECKER DANIEL P [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-17 * abstract * * examples 1-14,16-18 * [Y] 1-24; | [Y]EP0726265 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [Y] 1-7,10-17,23 * abstract * * page 5, lines 38-43 * * page 7, line 17 - page 8, line 34 *; | [XY]WO9638142 (GLIATECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-17 * abstract * * examples 1-26; claims 1-18; table 1 * [Y] 1-24; | [XY]WO9817651 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-7,10-17 * abstract * [Y] 1-24; | [Y]WO0034241 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [Y] 1-18,20 * the whole document *; | [XY]WO0053596 (SCHERING CORP [US]) [X] 1-7,10-17 * abstract * * page 4, line 10 - page 21, line 10; claims 1-18; table 1 * [Y] 1-24; | [XY]WO0078728 (NEUROSEARCH AS [DK], et al) [X] 1-7,10-14,16,17 * abstract * * page 6, line 27 - page 17, line 34 * * page 29, lines 29-40 * * page 30, line 9 - page 37, line 36; examples 10-13; claims 1-22 * [Y] 1-24; | [XY]WO0213821 (GLIATECH INC [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-17 * abstract * * page 2, line 13 - page 8, line 16; examples 1-8; claims 1-15 * [Y] 1-24; | [XY]WO0214285 (PFIZER LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,10-17 * abstract * * page 48, paragraph 4 - page 49, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-24; | [Y]EP1203584 (M D M S R L [IT]) [Y] 1-7,10-17,22 * abstract *; | [XY]WO03070732 (UPJOHN CO [US], et al) [X] 1-7,10-17 * abstract * * page 24, line 32 - page 25, line 2 * * page 27, lines 4,5 * * page 28, line 10 * * page 29, line 10 * * page 30, lines 13,14 * * page 32, line 10 * * page 36, line 10 * * page 39, line 26 * * page 41, lines 29,30 * * page 42, line 32 * * page 43, line 17 * * page 45, line 23 * * page 46, line 8 * * page 49, line 8 * * page 50, lines 11,12 * * page 57, line 3 - page 58, line 2 * [Y] 1-24; | [E]WO2004098625 (PROBIODRUG AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [E]WO2004098591 (PROBIODRUG AG [DE], et al) [E] 1-22 * abstract * * page 14, paragraph 8 - page 26, paragraph 4; table 2 * * page 38, paragraph 2 - page 49, paragraph 5; examples 1-40 *; | [E]US2004229848 (DEMUTH HANS-ULRICH [DE], et al) [E] 1-14,16-18,20 * paragraphs [0001] - [0004]; claims 1-26 * * paragraphs [0462] - [0486]; tables 2-4 * * paragraphs [0096] - [0107] * * paragraphs [1838] - [1861] *; | [E]EP1506776 (KEYNEUROTEK AG [DE]) [E] 1-23 * the whole document *; | [XY] - MISQUITTA S A ET AL, "CHARACTERIZATION OF THE INHIBITION OF GLUTAMINYL CYCLASE BY IMIDAZOLE DERIVATIVES AND PHENANTHROLINES", FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY. ANNUAL MEETING. ABSTRACTS OF PAPERS, (20020320), vol. 16, no. 4, page A157, XP009034877 [X] 1-7,10-12 * abstract * [Y] 1-24 | [XY] - MISQUITTA S A ET AL, "INHIBITION STUDIES OF GLUTAMINYL CYCLASE", FASEB JOURNAL (FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY), BETHESDA, US, (20010308), vol. 15, no. 5, ISSN 0892-6638, page A1159, XP009034875 [X] 1-7,10-12 * abstract * [Y] 1-24 | [XY] - PAPASTOITSIS G ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF A METALLPROTEASE FROM ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE BRAIN ABLE TO DEGRADE THE BETA-AMYLOID PRECURSOR PROTEIN AND GENERATE AMYLOIDOGENIC FRAGMENTS", BIOCHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. EASTON, PA, US, (19940111), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 192 - 199, XP000573979 [X] 1-7,10-15 * abstract * [Y] 1-24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00167a025 | [XY] - GASSEN M ET AL, "The potential role of iron chelators in the treatment of Parkinson's disease and related neurological disorders", PHARMACOLOGY AND TOXICOLOGY, MUNKSGAARD INTERNATIONAL PUBLISHERS, COPENHAGEN,, DK, (1997), vol. 80, ISSN 0901-9928, pages 159 - 166, XP002975073 [X] 1-7,10-14,16,17 * abstract * [Y] 1-24 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0773.1997.tb00390.x | [XY] - STIX B ET AL, "PROTEOLYSIS OF AA AMYLOID FIBRIL PROTEINS BY MATRIX METALLOPROTEINASES-1, -2, AND -3", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PATHOLOGY, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (200108), vol. 159, no. 2, ISSN 0002-9440, pages 561 - 570, XP008044201 [X] 1-7,10-17 * abstract * * page 561, column 1, paragraph 1 - column 2, paragraph 1 * [Y] 1-24 | [Y] - DUHAULT J ET AL, "FOOD INTAKE REGULATION IN RODENTS: Y5 OR Y1 NPY RECEPTORS OF BOTH?", CANADIAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY AND PHARMACOLOGY, OTTAWA, ONT, CA, (200002), vol. 2, no. 78, pages 173 - 185, XP008003362 [Y] 1-7,10-17,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/cjpp-78-2-173 | [Y] - KATSUBE N ET AL, "ONO-1603, A POTENTIAL ANTIDEMENTIA DRUG, DELAYS AGE-INDUCED APOPTOSIS AND SUPPRESSES OVEREXPRESSION OF GLYCERALDEHYDE-3-PHOSPHATE DEHYDROGENASE IN CULTURED CENTRAL NERVOUS SYSTEM NEURONS", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR PHARMACOLOGY AND, US, (1999), vol. 288, no. 1, ISSN 0022-3565, pages 6 - 13, XP001148479 [Y] 1-7,10-17,21 * the whole document * | [Y] - BELLEMÈRE GAËLLE ET AL, "Effect of S 17092, a novel prolyl endopeptidase inhibitor, on substance P and alpha-melanocyte-stimulating hormone breakdown in the rat brain.", JOURNAL OF NEUROCHEMISTRY. MAR 2003, (200303), vol. 84, no. 5, ISSN 0022-3042, pages 919 - 929, XP002353977 [Y] 1-17,21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1471-4159.2003.01536.x | [Y] - TIAN G ET AL, "Linear non-competitive inhibition of solubilized human gamma-secretase by peptide A methylaster, L685458, sulfonamides and benzodiazepines", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (20020830), vol. 277, no. 35, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 31499 - 31505, XP002970047 [Y] 1-7,10-17,24 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M112328200 | by applicant | JPS6137764B | EP0201742 | JPS62114978 | JPS62114957 | EP0232849 | EP0268281 | US4757083 | EP0275482 | EP0280956 | US4772587 | EP0303434 | JPH01143897 | JPH01250370 | US4873342 | EP0355793 | JPH02275858 | DE3939797 | US5028604 | EP0451547 | US5073549 | EP0461677 | JPH049367B | US5091432 | US5091406 | US5112847 | US5118811 | JPH04211648 | US5137905 | US5198458 | US5221752 | WO9312139 | WO9313065 | US5254550 | WO9400486 | WO9412474 | JPH06192298 | US5340832 | EP0618193 | US5407950 | WO9515309 | JPH07267988 | WO9612489 | WO9612490 | WO9622305 | US5552411 | US5567714 | EP0747357 | EP0747378 | WO9719911 | WO9720821 | WO9720820 | WO9720823 | JPH09157253 | WO9725041 | WO9746250 | WO9803493 | WO9807420 | WO9915498 | DE19616486 | WO9946272 | WO9967278 | DE19828114 | DE19834591 | WO0007617 | US6107317 | US6124305 | WO0068197 | WO0134594 | WO0155105 | WO0168603 | WO0181337 | WO0187293 | JP3255080B | WO0214271 | US6380398 | WO0238541 | WO02051836 | WO02066468 | WO02076450 | EP1262552 | WO03000181 | WO03002530 | WO03002553 | WO03004496 | WO03024965 | WO03033524 | WO03035067 | WO03035057 | WO03055881 | WO03057144 | WO03057204 | WO03068757 | GB2389113 | WO2004014885 | WO2004022544 | WO2004039773 | WO2004052348 | - POHL, T. ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI, (1991), vol. 88, pages 10059 - 10063 | - CONSALVO, A. P. ET AL., ANAL BIOCHEM, (1988), vol. 175, pages 131 - 138 | - DAHL, S. W. ET AL., PROTEIN EXPR PURIF, (2000), vol. 20, pages 27 - 36 | - ATACK ET AL., EUR. J. OF PHARM., (1991), vol. 205, pages 157 - 163 | - YAMADA, BIOORG. & MED. CHEM. LETT., (1998), vol. 8, pages 1537 - 1540 | - SUDRE ET AL., DIABETES, (2002), vol. 51, no. 5, pages 1461 - 1469 |