EP1680389 - METHOD FOR PURIFYING (METH)ACRYLIC ACID OBTAINED BY OXIDIZING A CASEOUS SUBSTRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.12.2007 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Arkema France 4-8, cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | [2006/31] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states Arkema 4-8 Cours Michelet 92800 Puteaux / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAUCONET, Michel 1, Rue des Champs 57730 Valmont / FR | 02 /
LAURENT, Denis 2, rue du Missouri 57500 Saint-Avold / FR | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | Bonnel, Claudine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/50] | Bonnel, Claudine, et al ARKEMA FRANCE Département Propriété Industrielle 4-8 cours Michelet La Défense 10 92091 Paris La Défense / FR | Application number, filing date | 04791448.6 | 01.10.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004FR02481 | Priority number, date | FR20030012906 | 04.11.2003 Original published format: FR 0312906 | [2006/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005054171 | Date: | 16.06.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/24] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1680389 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.06.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1680389 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.08.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C07C57/04, C07C57/07 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
C07C51/42 (EP,KR,US);
C07C51/44 (EP,KR,US);
C07C51/58 (KR);
C07C51/64 (KR)
| C-Set: |
C07C51/42, C07C57/04 (EP,US);
C07C51/44, C07C57/04 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR AUFREINIGUNG VON DURCH OXIDIEREN EINES GASFÖRMIGEN SUBSTRATS ERHALTENER (METH)ACRYLSÄURE | [2006/29] | English: | METHOD FOR PURIFYING (METH)ACRYLIC ACID OBTAINED BY OXIDIZING A CASEOUS SUBSTRATE | [2006/29] | French: | PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DE L'ACIDE (METH)ACRYLIQUE OBTENU PAR OXYDATION D'UN SUBSTRAT GAZEUX | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 26.10.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.11.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2007 | CY | 21.02.2007 | CZ | 21.02.2007 | DK | 21.02.2007 | EE | 21.02.2007 | FI | 21.02.2007 | GB | 21.02.2007 | IE | 21.02.2007 | IT | 21.02.2007 | NL | 21.02.2007 | PL | 21.02.2007 | RO | 21.02.2007 | SI | 21.02.2007 | SK | 21.02.2007 | TR | 21.02.2007 | BG | 21.05.2007 | SE | 21.05.2007 | GR | 22.05.2007 | ES | 01.06.2007 | PT | 23.07.2007 | HU | 22.08.2007 | LU | 01.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
HU | 22.08.2007 | ||
LU | 01.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CY | 21.02.2007 | ||
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
EE | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
IT | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
GR | 22.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/04] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
RO | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2008/02] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
CZ | 21.02.2007 | ||
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
GB | 21.02.2007 | ||
IE | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SK | 21.02.2007 | ||
BG | 21.05.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
PT | 23.07.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | AT | 21.02.2007 | |
DK | 21.02.2007 | ||
FI | 21.02.2007 | ||
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | ||
Former [2007/44] | FI | 21.02.2007 | |
NL | 21.02.2007 | ||
PL | 21.02.2007 | ||
SI | 21.02.2007 | ||
SE | 21.05.2007 | ||
ES | 01.06.2007 | Cited in | International search | [AD]FR2196986 (BASF AG [DE]) [AD] 1-16* figure -; example -; claim - *; | [A]EP0784046 (BASF AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * page 3, line 45 - page 5, line 10; figure 2 *; | [DA]EP1125912 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]) [DA] 1-16 * le document en entier * |