EP1678071 - ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE DISPENSING APPLIANCE WITH GAS CONNECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InBev S.A. Vaarstraat 94 3000 Leuven / BE | [2007/14] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Inbev S.A. Vaarstraat 94 3000 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMWADE, Stephen J. 72 Huntingdon Road, Upwood Huntingdon, Cambs PE26 2QQ / GB | 02 /
HALKET, Andrew R. B. 17 Fennec Close Cherry Hinton, Cambridge CB1 9GG / GB | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Gevers, François, et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/10] | Gevers, François, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen S.A., Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | ||
Former [2006/28] | Banzer, Hans-Jörg Kraus & Weisert, Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04791741.4 | 22.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004IB03476 | Priority number, date | GB20030024905 | 24.10.2003 Original published format: GB 0324905 | [2006/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005040035 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1678071 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1678071 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B67D1/04, F16L37/127 | [2006/28] | CPC: |
B67D1/0412 (EP,US);
B67D1/04 (KR);
B67D1/0462 (EP,US);
B67D1/0829 (EP,US);
B67D2001/0828 (EP,US);
F16L2201/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT MIT GASANSCHLUSS ZUR ABGABE EINES ALKOHOLISCHEN GETRÄNKES | [2006/28] | English: | ALCOHOLIC BEVERAGE DISPENSING APPLIANCE WITH GAS CONNECTION | [2006/28] | French: | APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR DE BOISSONS ALCOOLISEES A RACCORD A GAZ | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 26.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 25.09.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.01.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 04.04.2007 | CH | 04.04.2007 | CY | 04.04.2007 | DK | 04.04.2007 | EE | 04.04.2007 | FI | 04.04.2007 | IT | 04.04.2007 | LI | 04.04.2007 | PL | 04.04.2007 | SI | 04.04.2007 | SK | 04.04.2007 | TR | 04.04.2007 | BG | 04.07.2007 | SE | 04.07.2007 | GR | 05.07.2007 | ES | 15.07.2007 | PT | 04.09.2007 | LU | 22.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | [2009/44] |
Former [2009/41] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
LU | 22.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/35] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
CY | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
EE | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
IT | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
GR | 05.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SK | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/11] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
BG | 04.07.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2008/08] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
DK | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/51] | AT | 04.04.2007 | |
CH | 04.04.2007 | ||
FI | 04.04.2007 | ||
LI | 04.04.2007 | ||
PL | 04.04.2007 | ||
SI | 04.04.2007 | ||
SE | 04.07.2007 | ||
ES | 15.07.2007 | ||
PT | 04.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/47] | SI | 04.04.2007 | |
ES | 15.07.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2191579 (NELSON JOHN J) [A] 1* figure 4 *; | [A]US4850387 (BASSILL NICHOLAS [US]) [A] 1 * column 2, line 30 - line 46; figure 4 * * column 4, line 38 - line 57 *; | [A]WO0194250 (HEINEKEN TECH SERVICES [NL], et al) [A] 1 * page 1, line 8 - line 12; figure 1d * * page 4, line 31 - line 34 * |