EP1803607 - MIRROR SURFACE ANGLE ADJUSTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.03.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 18.10.2017 [2017/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murakami Corporation 12-25, Miyamoto-cho, Suruga-ku Shizuoka-shi, Shizuoka 422-8569 / JP | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKAI, Akira@Murakami Corporation Oigawa-Works 1700, Zenzaemon Fujieda-shi Shizuoka 426-0053 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Hisaya@Murakami Corporation Oigawa-Works 1700, Zenzaemon 3ujieda-shi Shizuoka 426-0053 / JP | 03 /
YAMANA, Tohru@Murakami Corporation Oigawa-Works 1700, Zenzaemon Fujieda-shi Shizuoka 426-0053 / JP | [2016/19] |
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
FUKAI, Akira Murakami Corporation Oigawa-Works 1700, Zenzaemon Fujieda-shi Shizuoka 426-0053 / JP | ||
02 /
SUZUKI, Hisaya Murakami Corporation Oigawa-Works 1700, Zenzaemon 3ujieda-shi Shizuoka 426-0053 / JP | |||
03 /
YAMANA, Tohru Murakami Corporation Oigawa-Works 1700, Zenzaemon Fujieda-shi Shizuoka 426-0053 / JP | Representative(s) | Gill, Stephen Charles, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [2016/19] |
Former [2007/27] | Gill, Stephen Charles, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04792220.8 | 08.10.2004 | [2007/27] | WO2004JP14951 | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006040803 | Date: | 20.04.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1803607 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803607 | Date: | 11.05.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B60R1/072 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
B60R1/072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2016/19] |
Former [2008/03] | DE, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SPIEGELFLÄCHENWINKELEINSTELLER | [2007/27] | English: | MIRROR SURFACE ANGLE ADJUSTER | [2007/27] | French: | ANGLEUR DE SURFACE DE MIROIR | [2007/27] | Entry into regional phase | 28.03.2007 | Translation filed | 28.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 31.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.03.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.03.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.03.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 14.02.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 21.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 11.05.2016 | GB | 08.10.2016 | FR | 02.11.2016 | [2017/42] |
Former [2017/04] | IT | 11.05.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US4598605 (MANZONI STEPHANE [FR]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [Y] 2; | [Y]US5293784 (GUTTENBERGER RICHARD [DE], et al) [Y] 2 * column 3, lines 25-57 *; | [A]US2002047386 (BINGLE ROBERT LEE [US], et al) [A] 1,2* the whole document * | International search | [X]JP2004230918 (ICHIKOH INDUSTRIES LTD) | by applicant | JP2004161123 |