EP1677097 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MEASURING THE CONCENTRATIONS OF FLUORESCENT DYES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.07.2011 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.08.2011 [2011/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HAMAMATSU PHOTONICS K. K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2006/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUMOTO, Kazuji, c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 02 /
HIRANO, Masahiko, 2c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | 03 /
HARA, Masahiro, 2c/o Hamamatsu Photonics K.K. 1126-1, Ichino-cho Hamamatsu-shi, Shizuoka 435-8558 / JP | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Frost, Alex John Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | Application number, filing date | 04792236.4 | 08.10.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004JP14968 | Priority number, date | JP20030352790 | 10.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003352790 | [2006/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005036143 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1677097 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/64, G01J3/44 | [2010/35] | CPC: |
G01N21/6458 (EP,US);
G01N21/6428 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6419 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6421 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6423 (EP,US);
G01N2021/6441 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/27] | G01N21/64 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/03] |
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER KONZENTRATION EINES FLUORESZENZPIGMENTS | [2006/27] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR MEASURING THE CONCENTRATIONS OF FLUORESCENT DYES | [2006/27] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME DE MESUREMENT DE LA CONCENTRATION DE COLORANTS FLUORESCENTES | [2006/27] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2006 | Translation filed | 27.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 27.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 08.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.02.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/33] | 29.03.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6403947 (HOYT CLIFFORD C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-8,10-12 * column 1, line 9 - column 3, line 33 * * column 5, line 50 - column 6, line 63 * * column 8, lines 28-40 * * column 17, line 65 - column 20, line 53 *[I] 3,9; | [X]US2003020908 (FROST KEITH L [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraphs [0002] - [0015] - [0037] , [38.62] , [0083] , [0114] - [0135]; figures 1,8,17,19 * | International search | [Y]WO0109592 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]); | [Y]JP2002168868 (SHIMADZU CORP); | [Y]JP2003270129 (YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORP); | [AP]JP2004163312 (ARKRAY INC) | [Y] - KAWADA S., "Imaging spectroscopy ni yoru pattern bunseki", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF OPTICS, (19890110), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 8 - 14, XP002987088 |