EP1689494 - AGENT FOR SKIN EXTERNAL USE CONTAINING SALT OF ASCORBIC ACID DERIVATIVE, METHOD FOR STABILIZING THE AGENT FOR SKIN EXTERNAL USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2006/33] | AGENT FOR SKIN EXTERNAL USE CONTAINING SALT OF ASCORBIC ACID DERIVATIVE, METHOD FOR STABILIZING THE AGENT FOR SKIN EXTERNAL USE, AND STABILIZER | ||
[2008/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Showa Denko K.K. 13-9, Shiba Daimon, 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8518 / JP | [2006/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO, Eiko, c/o Showa Denko K.K. Corporate R & D Center, 1-1-1, Oonodai, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP | 02 /
YONEDA, Tadashi, c/o Showa Denko K.K. Corporate R & D Center, 1-1-1, Oonodai, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP | 03 /
OGATA, Eiji, c/o Showa Denko K.K. Corporate R & D Center, 1-1-1, Oonodai, Midori-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 267-0056 / JP | [2006/33] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2006/33] | Application number, filing date | 04792623.3 | 13.10.2004 | [2006/33] | WO2004JP15457 | Priority number, date | JP20030353669 | 14.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003353669 | JP20040130206 | 26.04.2004 Original published format: JP 2004130206 | [2006/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005034903 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1689494 | Date: | 16.08.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1689494 | Date: | 03.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.04.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q19/00, A61K8/34, A61K8/37, A61K8/55, C07D307/62 | [2006/33] | CPC: |
A61K8/345 (EP,US);
A61K8/602 (EP,US);
A61K8/676 (EP,US);
A61Q19/00 (EP,US);
C07D307/62 (EP,US);
C07F9/65515 (EP,US);
A61K2800/52 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/33] | Extension states | AL | 31.03.2006 | HR | 31.03.2006 | LT | 31.03.2006 | LV | 31.03.2006 | MK | 31.03.2006 | Title | German: | FÜR DIE EXTERNE ANWENDUNG AUF DER HAUT VORGESEHENES MITTEL MIT EINEM SALZ EINES ASCORBINSÄUREDERIVATS, VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG DES MITTELS FÜR DIE EXTERNE ANWENDUNG AUF DER HAUT | [2008/13] | English: | AGENT FOR SKIN EXTERNAL USE CONTAINING SALT OF ASCORBIC ACID DERIVATIVE, METHOD FOR STABILIZING THE AGENT FOR SKIN EXTERNAL USE | [2008/13] | French: | AGENT A USAGE CUTANE EXTERNE CONTENANT UN SEL D'UN DERIVE DE L'ACIDE ASCORBIQUE, PROCEDE DE STABILISATION DE L'AGENT A USAGE CUTANE EXTERNE | [2008/13] |
Former [2006/33] | FÜR DIE EXTERNE ANWENDUNG AUF DER HAUT VORGESEHENES MITTEL MIT EINEM SALZ EINES ASCORBINSÄUREDERIVATS, VERFAHREN ZUR STABILISIERUNG DES MITTELS FÜR DIE EXTERNE ANWENDUNG AUF DER HAUT UND STABILISATOR | ||
Former [2006/33] | AGENT FOR SKIN EXTERNAL USE CONTAINING SALT OF ASCORBIC ACID DERIVATIVE, METHOD FOR STABILIZING THE AGENT FOR SKIN EXTERNAL USE, AND STABILIZER | ||
Former [2006/33] | AGENT A USAGE CUTANE EXTERNE CONTENANT UN SEL D'UN DERIVE DE L'ACIDE ASCORBIQUE, PROCEDE DE STABILISATION DE L'AGENT A USAGE CUTANE EXTERNE, ET STABILISANT | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2006 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.03.2005 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 31.03.2006 | Examination requested [2006/33] | 30.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 21.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.12.2008 | BE | 03.12.2008 | CY | 03.12.2008 | CZ | 03.12.2008 | DK | 03.12.2008 | EE | 03.12.2008 | FI | 03.12.2008 | NL | 03.12.2008 | PL | 03.12.2008 | RO | 03.12.2008 | SI | 03.12.2008 | SK | 03.12.2008 | TR | 03.12.2008 | BG | 03.03.2009 | SE | 03.03.2009 | GR | 04.03.2009 | PT | 04.05.2009 | HU | 04.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
HU | 04.06.2009 | ||
Former [2010/51] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
GR | 04.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/46] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
DK | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/44] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
SK | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/41] | AT | 03.12.2008 | |
BE | 03.12.2008 | ||
CZ | 03.12.2008 | ||
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
SE | 03.03.2009 | ||
PT | 04.05.2009 | ||
Former [2009/36] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
EE | 03.12.2008 | ||
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
RO | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/35] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
BG | 03.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | BE | 03.12.2008 | |
FI | 03.12.2008 | ||
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/26] | FI | 03.12.2008 | |
NL | 03.12.2008 | ||
PL | 03.12.2008 | ||
SI | 03.12.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2003267856 ; | [X]JP2003176217 ; | [X]EP1077066 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP]) [X] 1-18 * examples 8,10 *; | [PX]WO03086384 (SHOWA DENKO KK [JP], et al) [PX] 1-18 * example - *; | [X] - MOTOI T, "Skin cosmetics containing ascorbic acid derivatives", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS + INDEXES, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY. COLUMBUS, US, (19861215), vol. 24, no. 105, ISSN 0009-2258, XP002073274 [X] 1-18 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003267856 A 20030925 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1-18 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031008), vol. 2003, no. 10, & JP2003176217 A 20030624 (SHOWA DENKO KK) [X] 1-18 * abstract * |