EP1681009 - IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi, Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | [2016/40] |
Former [2016/39] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | ||
Former [2016/34] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 2951 Ishikawa-machi Hachioji-shi Tokyo 192-8507 / JP | ||
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states Olympus Corporation 43-2, Hatagaya 2-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-0072 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Kenji 1-2-2-H206, Utase, Mihama-ku Chiba-shi, Chiba 2610013 / JP | 02 /
HIRAKAWA, Katsumi 1-17-14-701, Hashimoto Sagamihara-shi, Kanagawa 2291103 / JP | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2006/29] | von Hellfeld, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04792661.3 | 20.10.2004 | [2006/29] | WO2004JP15495 | Priority number, date | JP20030365636 | 27.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003365636 | JP20030373927 | 04.11.2003 Original published format: JP 2003373927 | [2006/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005039399 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681009 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A61B1/00 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
A61B1/041 (EP,US);
A61B1/04 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/05] |
Former [2006/29] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDBEARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BILDBEARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND BILDBEARBEITUNGSPROGRAMM | [2006/29] | English: | IMAGE PROCESSING DEVICE, IMAGE PROCESSING METHOD, AND IMAGE PROCESSING PROGRAM | [2006/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES, PROCEDE DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES ET PROGRAMME DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGES | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2006 | Translation filed | 20.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 17.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/39] | 19.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.09.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0135813 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL], et al) [A] 1-30 * abstract ** figure 2 *; | [A]WO02073507 (GIVEN IMAGING LTD [IL], et al) [A] 2-5,12-15,22-25 * abstract * * figures 2-4 * * page 3, line 3 - page 3, line 7 * * page 6, line 16 - page 5, line 34 * * page 9, line 5 - page 9, line 19 *; | [Y]US2002171669 (MERON GAVRIEL [IL], et al) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]US2003073935 (SEGAWA HIDETAKE [JP], et al) [Y] 1-30 * abstract * * figures 1A,1B * * claims 1,3,7 * * paragraph [0073] * | International search | [A]JPH11225996 (OLYMPUS OPTICAL CO); | [AE]JP2004154176 (OLYMPUS CORP) | by applicant | US2002093484 | US2002171669 | US2003073935 |