EP1679296 - ETHER DERIVATIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | For all designated states Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 15-1 Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8315 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUZUMI, Tatsuya, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 02 /
SUZUKI, Tamotsu, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 03 /
YAMADA, Youji, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 04 /
FUJITA, Shinichi, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 05 /
SHIMA, Yoichiro, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 06 /
YAMAMOTO, Yoriko, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 07 /
YANO, Tetsuo, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | 08 /
NAKAGAWA, Tadakiyo, Ajinomoto Co., Inc. 1-1, Suzuki-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8681 / JP | [2006/28] | Representative(s) | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/28] | Nicholls, Kathryn Margaret Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 04792706.6 | 14.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004JP15556 | Priority number, date | JP20030354086 | 14.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003354086 | JP20040199934 | 06.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004199934 | [2006/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005035471 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1679296 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07C27/28, C07C275/30, C07C275/32, C07D213/30, C07D213/64 | [2006/37] | CPC: |
C07D213/64 (EP,US);
A61P1/04 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P11/08 (EP);
A61P13/02 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/12 (EP);
C07C275/30 (EP,US);
C07D213/30 (EP,US);
C07D215/38 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2006/28] | C07C27/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/28] | Extension states | AL | 04.05.2006 | HR | 04.05.2006 | LT | 04.05.2006 | LV | 04.05.2006 | MK | 04.05.2006 | Title | German: | ETHERDERIVAT | [2006/28] | English: | ETHER DERIVATIVE | [2006/28] | French: | DERIVE ETHERE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2006 | Translation filed | 04.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 04.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 06.07.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/19] | 04.12.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/19] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2013 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO9406770 (LEO PHARM PROD LTD [DK], et al) [X] 1 * page 14, line 15 - line 16 * * claims 1,11 * [A] 1,24; | [X]WO0107409 (ASTRAZENECA UK LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1 * example 224 *; | [AD]WO0216317 (PACIFIC CORP [KR], et al) [AD] 1,24* claims 1,5 *; | [X] - CLAPP, LEALLYN B., "Reactions of ethylenimines. III. With phenols", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (1951), vol. 73, pages 2584 - 2586, XP002458712 [X] 1 * page 2586, column 2, line 16 - line 30 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja01150a045 | International search | [A]WO03070247 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) |