EP1676327 - PURIFICATION OF HOLE TRANSPORTING MATERIAL BY MEANS OF ULTRAFILTRATION AND ION EXCHANGE CHROMATOGRAPHY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 08.08.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2008 | Refusal of application | published on 10.09.2008 [2008/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Seiko Epson Corporation 4-1, Nishi-Shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | For all designated states SEIKO EPSON CORPORATION 4-1, Nishi-shinjuku 2-chome Shinjuku-ku Tokyo 163-0811 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINOHARA, Yuji, c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | 02 /
SHINOHARA, Takashi, c/o Seiko Epson Corporation 3-5, Owa 3-chome Suwa-shi, Nagano 392-8502 / JP | [2006/27] | Representative(s) | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/27] | Cloughley, Peter Andrew, et al Miller Sturt Kenyon, 9 John Street London WC1N 2ES / GB | Application number, filing date | 04792719.9 | 14.10.2004 | [2006/27] | WO2004JP15569 | Priority number, date | JP20030362510 | 22.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003362510 | JP20030362511 | 22.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003362511 | [2006/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005041321 | Date: | 06.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1676327 | Date: | 05.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.05.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H01L51/30 | [2006/27] | CPC: |
H10K71/12 (EP,US);
H10K10/00 (KR);
H10K85/1135 (EP,US);
H10K50/14 (EP,US);
H10K85/113 (EP,US);
H10K85/114 (EP,US);
H10K85/30 (EP,US);
H10K85/324 (EP,US);
H10K85/341 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/05] |
Former [2006/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | REINIGUNG EINES LOCHTRANSPORTMATERIALS MITTELS ULTRAFILTRIERUNG UND IONENAUSTAUSCH-CHROMATOGRAPHIE | [2006/27] | English: | PURIFICATION OF HOLE TRANSPORTING MATERIAL BY MEANS OF ULTRAFILTRATION AND ION EXCHANGE CHROMATOGRAPHY | [2006/27] | French: | PURIFICATION DE MATERIAU DE TRANSPORT DE TROUS PAR ULTRAFILTRATION ET CHROMATOGRAPHIE D'ECHANGE D'IONS | [2006/27] | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/27] | 07.08.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.02.2008 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/37] | 22.02.2008 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.04.2008 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 11.04.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH0687911 ; | [A]EP1063869 (IDEMITSU KOSAN CO [JP]); | [A]EP1087448 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB [JP]); | [X]KR20030078731 ; | US2004018386 [ ] (NAITO KATSUYUKI [JP], et al); | by applicant | JP2002175885 | US2004018386 |