EP1679723 - MULTILAYER RESISTIVE ELEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.07.2018 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto 617-8555 / JP | [2006/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Yasunori c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 02 /
KOTO, Kiyohiro c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | 03 /
KAWASE, Masahiko c/o MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | [2017/36] |
Former [2006/28] | 01 /
ITO, Yasunori, MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | ||
02 /
KOTO, Kiyohiro, MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | |||
03 /
KAWASE, Masahiko, MURATA MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 10-1, Higashikotari 1-chome Nagaokakyo-shi, Kyoto-fu 617-8555 / JP | Representative(s) | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Radlkoferstrasse 2 81373 München / DE | [2017/36] |
Former [2013/50] | Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann Stöckeler & Zinkler & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2006/28] | Schoppe, Fritz Patentanwälte Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler P.O. Box 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | Application number, filing date | 04793152.2 | 28.10.2004 | [2006/28] | WO2004JP16044 | Priority number, date | JP20030372846 | 31.10.2003 Original published format: JP 2003372846 | [2006/28] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005043556 | Date: | 12.05.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1679723 | Date: | 12.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.05.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1679723 | Date: | 06.09.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.05.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01C7/04, H01C7/18 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
H01C7/18 (EP,KR,US);
H01C7/02 (KR);
H01C7/04 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2006/28] | H01C7/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/36] |
Former [2006/28] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGES WIDERSTANDELEMENT | [2006/28] | English: | MULTILAYER RESISTIVE ELEMENT | [2006/28] | French: | ELEMENT RESISTIF MULTICOUCHE | [2006/28] | Entry into regional phase | 07.04.2006 | Translation filed | 07.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.04.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/28] | 31.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.02.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 16.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 02.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 25.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.10.2004 | AT | 06.09.2017 | CY | 06.09.2017 | CZ | 06.09.2017 | DK | 06.09.2017 | EE | 06.09.2017 | ES | 06.09.2017 | FI | 06.09.2017 | IT | 06.09.2017 | MC | 06.09.2017 | NL | 06.09.2017 | PL | 06.09.2017 | PT | 06.09.2017 | RO | 06.09.2017 | SE | 06.09.2017 | SI | 06.09.2017 | SK | 06.09.2017 | TR | 06.09.2017 | IE | 28.10.2017 | LU | 28.10.2017 | BE | 31.10.2017 | CH | 31.10.2017 | LI | 31.10.2017 | FR | 06.11.2017 | BG | 06.12.2017 | GB | 06.12.2017 | GR | 07.12.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/16] | HU | 28.10.2004 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
TR | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GB | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 28.10.2004 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CY | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GB | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 28.10.2004 | |
AT | 06.09.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GB | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GB | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
IE | 28.10.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
FR | 06.11.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/36] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
BE | 31.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
LU | 28.10.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
DK | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
MC | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
CH | 31.10.2017 | ||
LI | 31.10.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
IT | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 06.09.2017 | |
CZ | 06.09.2017 | ||
EE | 06.09.2017 | ||
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
PL | 06.09.2017 | ||
RO | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
SK | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | CZ | 06.09.2017 | |
ES | 06.09.2017 | ||
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/15] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
NL | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | ES | 06.09.2017 | |
FI | 06.09.2017 | ||
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
BG | 06.12.2017 | ||
GR | 07.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 06.09.2017 | |
SE | 06.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 06.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPH02260605 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [A] 1,6,7,9* abstract *; | [Y]JPH11111554 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9 * abstract *; | [Y]JP2001035707 (TDK CORP) [Y] 1-4,6,7,9 * abstract *; | [A]US2002089409 (ISHII TAKEHIKO [JP]) [A] 1,3,4,6,7,9 * abstract * | International search | [X]JPH10247601 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO); | [Y]JPH05243007 (MURATA MANUFACTURING CO) |