EP1681918 - AN IMPROVED FLUID TREATMENT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 10.04.2009 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.05.2009 [2009/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eliminator Holdings Limited PO Box 5538 Hamilton, 2001 / NZ | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASON, Rex, Allan 3 Lorraine Place Hamilton, 2001 / NZ | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Ipulse 26 Mallinson Road London SW11 1BP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/03] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Ipulse 5th floor 9-10 Savile Row London W1S 3PF / GB | ||
Former [2006/30] | Murphy, Colm Damien, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP, 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | Application number, filing date | 04793713.1 | 12.10.2004 | [2006/30] | WO2004NZ00249 | Priority number, date | NZ20030528893 | 13.10.2003 Original published format: NZ 52889303 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005034612 | Date: | 21.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1681918 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 21.04.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.11.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01J5/00, A01J11/00, A01J11/04, A01J19/00 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
A01J19/00 (EP,US);
A01J11/00 (EP,US);
A01J11/04 (EP,US);
A01J5/041 (EP,US);
A01J5/044 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTES FLUIDBEHANDLUNGSSYSTEM | [2006/30] | English: | AN IMPROVED FLUID TREATMENT SYSTEM | [2006/30] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRAITEMENT DE FLUIDE PERFECTIONNE | [2006/30] | Entry into regional phase | 09.05.2006 | National basic fee paid | 09.05.2006 | Search fee paid | 09.05.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.05.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 01.04.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB365290 (EUGENE FREYSSINET, et al) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]GB407743 (ALUMINIUM PLANT & VESSEL CO, et al) [X] 1-12* the whole document *; | [X]GB522918 (JOHN ARTHUR JOHNSON) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]DE1519563 (BASF AG) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS53113882 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]JPS59109209 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [X] 1-12 * the whole document * | International search | [A]DE2836845 ; | [A]DE2855653 ; | [A]WO9322902 (PELLONPAJA OY [FI], et al); | [A]US6345590 (CATTANEO MARCO [IT]) | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1980-20346C, & DE2836845 A1 00000000 | [A] - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 1980-46435C, & DE2855653 A1 00000000 |