EP1673928 - ARRANGEMENT FOR AUTONOMOUS MOBILE NETWORK NODES TO ORGANIZE A WIRELESS MOBILE NETWORK BASED ON DETECTED PHYSICAL AND LOGICAL CHANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.11.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cisco Technology, Inc. 170 West Tasman Drive San Jose, CA 95134 / US | [2006/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOON, Billy, Gayle 101 Bannerman Lane Cary, NC 27519 / US | 02 /
THUBERT, Pascal La Pinatelo Villa, 13, chemin des Bas Campons F-06480 La Colle Sur Loup / FR | [2006/26] | Representative(s) | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/17] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | ||
Former [2008/32] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2006/26] | Kazi, Ilya, et al Mathys & Squire 120 Holborn GB-London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 04794071.3 | 04.10.2004 | [2006/26] | WO2004US32587 | Priority number, date | US20030679312 | 07.10.2003 Original published format: US 679312 | [2006/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005039151 | Date: | 28.04.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/17] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1673928 | Date: | 28.06.2006 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.04.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1673928 | Date: | 25.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04W40/24, H04W84/18 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
H04L67/125 (EP,US);
G05D1/0088 (EP,US);
H04L67/12 (EP,US);
H04W40/24 (EP,US);
H04W84/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2011/03] | G06F17/00, B64C39/02, F41G9/00, B25J13/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/44] | G06F17/00 | ||
Former IPC [2006/26] | H04M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/17] |
Former [2006/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANORDNUNG FÜR AUTONOME MOBILNETZWERKKNOTEN ZUM ORGANISIEREN EINES DRAHTLOSEN MOBILNETZWERKS AUF DER BASIS ERKANNTER PHYSISCHER UND LOGISCHER ÄNDERUNGEN | [2006/26] | English: | ARRANGEMENT FOR AUTONOMOUS MOBILE NETWORK NODES TO ORGANIZE A WIRELESS MOBILE NETWORK BASED ON DETECTED PHYSICAL AND LOGICAL CHANGES | [2006/26] | French: | AGENCEMENT DESTINE À DES NOEUDS DE RESÉAU MOBILE AUTONOME ET PERMETTANT D'ORGANISER UN RÉSEAU MOBILE SANS FIL EN FONCTION DE CHANGEMENTS PHYSIQUES ET LOGIQUES DETECTÉS | [2017/51] |
Former [2006/26] | AGENCEMENT DESTINE A DES NOEUDS DE RESEAU MOBILE AUTONOME ET PERMETTANT D'ORGANISER UN RESEAU MOBILE SANS FIL EN FONCTION DE CHANGEMENTS PHYSIQUES ET LOGIQUES DETECTES | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.04.2006 | Examination requested [2006/26] | 03.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 19.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.03.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.10.2004 | AT | 25.04.2018 | CY | 25.04.2018 | CZ | 25.04.2018 | DK | 25.04.2018 | EE | 25.04.2018 | ES | 25.04.2018 | FI | 25.04.2018 | IT | 25.04.2018 | MC | 25.04.2018 | NL | 25.04.2018 | PL | 25.04.2018 | RO | 25.04.2018 | SE | 25.04.2018 | SI | 25.04.2018 | SK | 25.04.2018 | TR | 25.04.2018 | BG | 25.07.2018 | GR | 26.07.2018 | PT | 27.08.2018 | IE | 04.10.2018 | LU | 04.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | CH | 31.10.2018 | FR | 31.10.2018 | LI | 31.10.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 04.10.2004 | |
AT | 25.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
TR | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
FR | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
IE | 04.10.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
CH | 31.10.2018 | ||
LI | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
LU | 04.10.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
MC | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SI | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
IT | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 25.04.2018 | |
CZ | 25.04.2018 | ||
DK | 25.04.2018 | ||
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
RO | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
SK | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
EE | 25.04.2018 | ||
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 25.04.2018 | |
ES | 25.04.2018 | ||
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
PT | 27.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
GR | 26.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
PL | 25.04.2018 | ||
SE | 25.04.2018 | ||
BG | 25.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 25.04.2018 | |
FI | 25.04.2018 | ||
NL | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | NL | 25.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003005030 (SUTTON JEFFREY P [US], et al) [X] 1-25 * abstract * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0059] - paragraph [0060] * * figures 3, 4 *; | [XP]US2004030450 (SOLOMON NEAL [US]) [XP] 1,12,25 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0030] ** paragraph [0176] * | International search | [A]US5634010 (CISCON LARRY A [US], et al); | [A]US6327594 (VAN HUBEN GARY A [US], et al); | [A]US6542925 (BROWN DAVID W [US], et al) | by applicant | US2003005030 |